AIR v. USEPA, et al
Petitioner: ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, a California non-profit corporation
Respondent: MIKE STOKER, in his official capacity as Regional Administrator for Region IX of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Not Yet Classified: SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT and SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY UNIFIED AIR POLLUTION CONTROL DISTRICT
Case Number: 19-71223
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11360909] (BS) [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:20 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Added attorney Brent Newell for AIR. [11351955] (RL) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:45 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Respondent USEPA agency certified list. Date of service: 07/02/2019 [11351690] [19-71223] (Greenberg, Alan) [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:30 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brent Joseph Newell for Petitioner AIR. Date of service: 07/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11351533] [19-71223] (Newell, Brent) [Entered: 07/02/2019 08:21 AM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Petitioner AIR response opposing motion ([ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 06/24/2019. [11342507] [19-71223] (Packard, Andrew) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:58 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Petitioner AIR response non-opposing motion/form/notice at [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing). Date of service: 06/24/2019. I certify that I have separately notified all parties not registered for Appellate Electronic Filing in this case with notice of this non-opposition. [11342429] [19-71223] (Packard, Andrew) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:41 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending SCAQMD. [11332552] (RR) [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:23 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending San Joaquin Valley Unified Air Pollution Control District. [11332529] (RR) [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:17 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) South Coast Air Quality Management District Motion to intervene. Date of service: 06/14/2019. [11332443] [19-71223] (Reichert, Mary) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:40 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) San Joaquin Valley Unified Air Pollution Control District Motion to intervene. Date of service: 06/14/2019. [11331962] [19-71223] (Ballatore-Williamson, Annette) [Entered: 06/14/2019 01:10 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/27/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11329778] (BS) [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:56 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Jon Michael Lipshultz in 19-71223 substituted by Attorney Alan David Greenberg in 19-71223 [11314608] (RR) [Entered: 05/30/2019 07:35 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan David Greenberg for Respondents Mike Stoker, USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Substitution for Attorney Jon Michael Lipshultz for Respondents Mike Stoker, USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Date of service: 05/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11312864] [19-71223] (Greenberg, Alan) [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:17 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11309458] (AD) [Entered: 05/24/2019 06:44 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Petitioner AIR Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/24/2019. [11309116] [19-71223] (Carlon, William) [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:06 PM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/24/2019. Petitioner brief due 08/05/2019 for Association of Irritated Residents. Respondent brief due 09/04/2019 for Mike Stoker, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11301816] (JMR) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: AIR v. USEPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, a California non-profit corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lloyd Packard
Represented By: William Nazar Carlon
Represented By: Brent Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MIKE STOKER, in his official capacity as Regional Administrator for Region IX of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Jon Michael Lipshultz
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Jon Michael Lipshultz
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Jon Michael Lipshultz
Represented By: Alan David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOUTH COAST AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Represented By: Mary Judith Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAN JOAQUIN VALLEY UNIFIED AIR POLLUTION CONTROL DISTRICT
Represented By: Annette A. Ballatore-Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?