Georgette Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGETTE G. PURNELL
Defendant / Appellee: RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. and SERVICE WEST, INC.
Case Number: 20-15023
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) to amend the due date for the answering brief is denied. The appellant is informed that the filing of the appellants opening brief before the due date does not advance the due date for the appellees answering briefs. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.1(a). The appellees answering briefs remain due May 15, 2020. The appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [11611019] (AF) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:24 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Filed original and 4 copies of Appellant Georgette G. Purnell opening brief of 7 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 02/07/2020. [11598059] (LA) [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:23 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Georgette G. Purnell motion for an order shortening the itmes mention in schedule. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/07/2020. [11597094] (RR) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:58 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Georgette G. Purnell motion to take judicial notice; Rules of Evid Rule 201. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/07/2020. [11597084] (RR) [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:56 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 02/05/2020. Transcript due 03/06/2020. Appellant Georgette G. Purnell opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellees Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. and Service West, Inc. answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11554066] (RT) [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Georgette Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGETTE G. PURNELL
Represented By: Georgette G. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC.
Represented By: Mark J. Divelbiss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERVICE WEST, INC.
Represented By: Kristin E. Hutchins Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?