Chamber of Commerce of the USA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HOME CARE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR HEALTH SERVICES AT HOME, NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION, CALIFORNIA RETAILERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECURITY COMPANIES and CALIFORNIA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Defendant / Appellant: KEVIN RICHARD KISH, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Fair Employment and Housing of the State of California, LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as the Labor Commissioner of the State of California, JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as the Secretary of the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency and XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 20-15291
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Kevin Richard Kish and Julie A. Su Correspondence: NOTICE: The Court is notified that due to logistical issues related to the COVID-19 virus, Defendants-Appellants require a 60-day extension of time to file the Appellants Opening Brief, currently due on March 18, 2020.. Date of service: 03/17/2020 [11632135] [20-15291] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:13 AM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11620471] (VS) [Entered: 03/06/2020 09:44 AM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11617251]. [20-15291] (AD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 06:44 PM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Kevin Richard Kish and Julie A. Su Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/03/2020. [11616673] [20-15291] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 03/03/2020 01:34 PM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11615958] (LW) [Entered: 03/03/2020 09:16 AM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 19, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than March 18, 2020; the answering brief is due April 15, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11608673] (RT) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:13 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11605925] (JBS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chamber of Commerce of the USA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Donald Manwell Falk
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HOME CARE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Maurice Baskin Esquire
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR HEALTH SERVICES AT HOME
Represented By: Maurice Baskin Esquire
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION
Represented By: Maurice Baskin Esquire
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA RETAILERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Maurice Baskin Esquire
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECURITY COMPANIES
Represented By: Maurice Baskin Esquire
Represented By: Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Donald Manwell Falk
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN RICHARD KISH, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Fair Employment and Housing of the State of California
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as the Labor Commissioner of the State of California
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as the Secretary of the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?