GCNA v. Falcone Brothers & Associates, et al
Defendant / Appellant: NADURI LLC, an Arizona limited liability company, BALATAZZA, INC., an Arizona corporation, FALCONE BROTHERS & ASSOCIATES, INC., an Arizona corporation, GAETANO FALCONE, GEORGIA FALCONE, individually and as a married couple, MONTEDORO LLC, an Arizona limited liability company, DARLENE FALCONE, individually and as a married couple and SALVATORE FALCONE
Plaintiff / Appellee: GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation
Case Number: 20-15317
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 7 ] and excerpts of record [ # 8 ] submitted by appellants are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11671109] (KWG) [Entered: 04/24/2020 01:22 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Balatazza, Inc., Falcone Brothers & Associates, Inc., Darlene Falcone, Gaetano Falcone, Georgia Falcone, Salvatore Falcone, Montedoro LLC and Naduri LLC. Date of service: 04/24/2020. [11670963] [20-15317] (Kelly, Matthew) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:55 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Balatazza, Inc., Falcone Brothers & Associates, Inc., Darlene Falcone, Gaetano Falcone, Georgia Falcone, Salvatore Falcone, Montedoro LLC and Naduri LLC. Date of service: 04/24/2020. [11670957] [20-15317] (Kelly, Matthew) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:53 AM]
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11658885] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:22 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/01/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11634037] (VS) [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:08 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/12/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11628579]. [20-15317] (AD) [Entered: 03/12/2020 06:44 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Balatazza, Inc., Falcone Brothers & Associates, Inc., Darlene Falcone, Gaetano Falcone, Georgia Falcone, Salvatore Falcone, Montedoro LLC and Naduri LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/12/2020. [11628357] [20-15317] (Kelly, Matthew) [Entered: 03/12/2020 03:54 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11628037] (LW) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:07 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Balatazza, Inc., Darlene Falcone, Gaetano Falcone, Georgia Falcone, Salvatore Falcone, Falcone Brothers & Associates, Inc., Montedoro LLC and Naduri LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/05/2020. Appellants Balatazza, Inc., Darlene Falcone, Gaetano Falcone, Georgia Falcone, Salvatore Falcone, Falcone Brothers & Associates, Inc., Montedoro LLC and Naduri LLC opening brief due 04/27/2020. Appellee Guarantee Company of North America USA answering brief due 05/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11610678] (JBS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: GCNA v. Falcone Brothers & Associates, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NADURI LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BALATAZZA, INC., an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FALCONE BROTHERS & ASSOCIATES, INC., an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GAETANO FALCONE
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGIA FALCONE, individually and as a married couple
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MONTEDORO LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARLENE FALCONE, individually and as a married couple
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SALVATORE FALCONE
Represented By: Kevin C. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Kelly
Represented By: Matthew J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, a Michigan corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Berens Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?