Jeremiah Balik v. City of Torrance, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, NEVADA HIGHWAY PATROL, CITY OF TORRANCE, CITY OF CHICAGO, LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, VALVOLINE INC., CITY OF LOS ANGELES, FRED S. UPTON FOUNDATION, JM FOODS, INC., Jersey Mike, CITY OF CEDAR FALLS, BRISTOL FARMS, SAN DIEGO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, NEXT GENERATION WIRELESS, CITY OF SAN BERNADINO, SANTA BARBARA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT., CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL, CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS and GELSON'S INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEREMIAH W. BALIK and JEREMIAH WILLIAM BALIK
Case Number: 20-15324
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 Filed Appellant Professor Jeremiah William Balik add'l evidence. deficiency: None. [11667174]. (RR) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:53 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellants motions to submit additional evidence (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 16 ] & [ # 17 ]) are referred to the panel that will be assigned to decide the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11662407] (AF) [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:53 PM]
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 Received Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik notice regarding additional evdience. [11660740] (RR) [Entered: 04/14/2020 01:53 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 Added Attorney(s) Gregg Kettles for party(s) Appellee City of San Bernadino, in case 20-15324. [11654778] (RR) [Entered: 04/07/2020 05:03 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregg W. Kettles (Best Best & Krieger LLP, 300 S. Grand Avenue, 25th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee City of San Bernadino. Date of service: 04/07/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11654093] [20-15324] (Kettles, Gregg) [Entered: 04/07/2020 12:31 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 Terminated Patrick C. McDonnell for Fred S. Upton Foundation in 20-15324 (no longer with firm) [11653156] (TYL) [Entered: 04/06/2020 04:22 PM]
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik request to submit additional evidence-USPIS FOLA. Deficiencies: No certificate of service. [11654801] (RR) [Entered: 04/07/2020 05:19 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 Filed original and 4 copies of Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik opening brief of 30 pages (Informal: No). Served on 03/16/2020. [11644663] (LA) [Entered: 03/27/2020 05:10 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 Filed order (MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND and ERIC D. MILLER): The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The motion to submit the opening brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief received on March 19, 2020 (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]). The answering brief is due May 15, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. [11644653] (AF) [Entered: 03/27/2020 05:04 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 Attorney Jason Guinasso in 20-15324 substituted by Attorney Avi William Rutschman in 20-15324 [11644295] (RR) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:36 PM]
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Avi W. Rutschman (Best Best & Krieger LLP, 2855 E. Guasti Road, Suite 400, Ontario, CA 912761) for Appellee City of San Bernadino. Substitution for Attorney Jason Guinasso, Esquire for Appellee City of San Bernadino. Date of service: 03/27/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11643831] [20-15324] (Rutschman, Avi) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:16 AM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik motion to submit appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11640702] (RR) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:11 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Received original and 3 copies of Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik opening brief (Informal: No) 30 pages. Served on 03/16/2020. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11637261]--[Received 1 additional copy of the brief. 03/24/2020 by KWG] (KWG) [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:48 PM]
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik letter dated 03/11/2020 re: Service of process/POS for IFP application. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11631435] (QDL) [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:20 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: No proof of service. [11625124] (RR) [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:15 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Mark Jason Austin for party(s) Appellee City of Torrance, in case 20-15324. [11620030] (RR) [Entered: 03/05/2020 04:41 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark Jason Austin (BURKE, WILLIAMS & SORENSEN, LLP, 1851 E. First Street, Suite 1550, Santa Ana, CA 92705) for Appellee City of Torrance. Date of service: 03/05/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11619248] [20-15324] (Austin, Mark) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:33 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11612994] (CKP) [Entered: 02/28/2020 01:55 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik opening brief due 04/27/2020. Appellees Bristol Farms, California Highway Patrol, City of Cedar Falls, City of Chicago, City of Citrus Heights, City of Los Angeles, City of Manhattan Beach, City of San Bernadino, City of Torrance, Fred S. Upton Foundation, Gelson's Inc., JM foods, Inc., Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, Nevada Highway Patrol, Next Generation Wireless, San Diego County Sheriff's Department, Santa Barbara County Sheriff's Dept. and Valvoline Inc. answering brief due 05/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11611538] (JPD) [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeremiah Balik v. City of Torrance, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH
Represented By: Jennifer Petrusis
Represented By: George Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEVADA HIGHWAY PATROL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF TORRANCE
Represented By: Michael R. Brooks Esquire
Represented By: Mark Jason Austin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALVOLINE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRED S. UPTON FOUNDATION
Represented By: Terry Allen Coffing Esquire
Represented By: Patrick C. McDonnell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JM FOODS, INC., Jersey Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CEDAR FALLS
Represented By: Doreen Spears-Hartwell
Represented By: Doreen Marry Spears Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRISTOL FARMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAN DIEGO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEXT GENERATION WIRELESS
Represented By: Doreen Spears-Hartwell
Represented By: Doreen Marry Spears Hartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SAN BERNADINO
Represented By: Jason Guinasso Esquire
Represented By: Avi William Rutschman
Represented By: Gregg Kettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANTA BARBARA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GELSON'S INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMIAH W. BALIK
Represented By: Jeremiah W. Balik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMIAH WILLIAM BALIK
Represented By: Jeremiah William Balik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?