Suzanne Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant / Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., FKA Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, FKA World Savings Bank, FSB
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUZANNE BROWN
Case Number: 20-15331
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Robert Collings Little for party(s) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in case 20-15331. [11626099] (RR) [Entered: 03/11/2020 11:20 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert Collings Little (Anglin Flewelling Rasmussen Campbell & Trytten LLP, 301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 1100, Pasadena, California 91101-4158) for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 03/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11625961] [20-15331] (Little, Robert) [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:20 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11612981] (CKP) [Entered: 02/28/2020 01:52 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Suzanne Brown opening brief due 04/27/2020. Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 05/26/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11611759] (JPD) [Entered: 02/27/2020 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Suzanne Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., successor by merger with Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, N.A., FKA Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, FKA World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Michael Rapkine Esquire
Represented By: Robert Collings Little Esquire
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUZANNE BROWN
Represented By: Suzanne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?