Bethany Mendez, et al v. CTA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NORM ENFIELD, in his official capacity as Chino Valley Unified School District Superintendent, FREMONT UNIFIED DISTRICT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION, KIM WALLACE, in her official capacity as Fremont Unified School District Superintendent, VALLEY CENTER-PAUMA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATED CHINO TEACHERS, CALIFORNIA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION, HAYWARD EDUCATION ASSOCIATION-CTA-NEA, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TUSTIN EDUCATORS ASSOCIATION, GREGORY FRANKLIN, in his official capacity as Tustin Unified School District Superintendent, XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, RON MCCOWAN, in his official capacity as Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District and MATT WAYNE, in his official capacity as Hayward Unified School District Superintendent
Plaintiff / Appellant: SCOTT CARPENTER, LINDA LEIGH-DICK, AUDREY STEWART, ANGELA WILLIAMS, an individual, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, BETHANY MENDEZ, JENNIFER GRIBBEN, an individual and STEPHANIE CHRISTIE, an individual
Case Number: 20-15394
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 Entered appearance of Appellants Stephanie Christie and Jennifer Gribben. [11676756] (AF) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:00 PM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SZ): Appellants unopposed motion to amend caption (Docket Entry No. [ # 17 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to add Stephanie Christie and Jennifer Gribben as additional appellants in this appeal. Appellate proceedings remain stayed. [11676748] (AF) [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:55 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to change caption]. Date of service: 04/16/2020. [11663453] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:08 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Errata to excerpts of record ([ # 12 ] Excerpts of Record Submitted (ECF Filing)). Filed by Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams. Date of service: 04/16/2020. [11663398] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 04/16/2020 02:53 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): The unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 14 ] ) of appellees California Teachers Association, et al., to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed pending resolution of Belgau v. Inslee, No. 19-35137, or until further order of the court. Appellees shall file a status report on June 29, 2020 and every 90 days thereafter while resolution of Belgau v. Inslee is pending. Appellees shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days after resolution of Belgau v. Inslee. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The remaining briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. [11649097] (RT) [Entered: 04/01/2020 03:17 PM]
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellees Associated Chino Teachers, CTA, Fremont Unified District Teachers Association, Hayward Education Association-CTA-NEA, National Education Association, Tustin Educators Association and Valley Center-Pauma Teachers Association Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 03/30/2020. [11646028] [20-15394] (Murray, Matthew) [Entered: 03/30/2020 03:24 PM]
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 11 ] and excerpts of record [ # 12 ] submitted by appellants are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11642363] (KWG) [Entered: 03/26/2020 09:09 AM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Audrey Stewart, Angela Williams and Bethany Mendez. Date of service: 03/25/2020. [11641847] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:16 PM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams. Date of service: 03/25/2020. [11641813] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 03/25/2020 02:57 PM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) James G. Abernathy for party(s) Appellant Linda Leigh-Dick Appellant Audrey Stewart Appellant Angela Williams Appellant Scott Carpenter Appellant Bethany Mendez, in case 20-15394. [11641387] (NAC) [Entered: 03/25/2020 11:24 AM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Gideon Abernathy (Freedom Foundation) for Appellants Linda Leigh-Dick, Scott Carpenter, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams. Date of service: 03/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11641376] [20-15394] (Abernathy, James) [Entered: 03/25/2020 11:19 AM]
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: Mediation efforts have been exhausted. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Accordingly, this case is released from the Mediation Program. [11641184] (VS) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:00 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Entered appearance of Appellee Matt Wayne. [11639773] (BY) [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:52 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Glenn Rothner for party(s) Appellee Kim Wallace, in case 20-15394. [11639765] (BY) [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:48 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams Correspondence: Appellants do not intend to order any transcripts.. Date of service: 03/20/2020 [11636714] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 03/20/2020 12:05 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/25/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11626604] (VS) [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:05 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11625549]. [20-15394] (AD) [Entered: 03/10/2020 06:44 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/10/2020. [11625367] [20-15394] (Sweigart, Karin) [Entered: 03/10/2020 04:35 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 04/06/2020. Transcript due 05/04/2020. Appellants Scott Carpenter, Linda Leigh-Dick, Bethany Mendez, Audrey Stewart and Angela Williams opening brief due 06/12/2020. Appellees Associated Chino Teachers, Xavier Becerra, California Teachers Association, Norm Enfield, Gregory Franklin, Fremont Unified District Teachers Association, Hayward Education Association-CTA-NEA, Ron McCowan, National Education Association, Tustin Educators Association, Valley Center-Pauma Teachers Association and Kim Wallace answering brief due 07/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11620949] (RT) [Entered: 03/06/2020 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bethany Mendez, et al v. CTA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORM ENFIELD, in his official capacity as Chino Valley Unified School District Superintendent
Represented By: Mark Robert Bresee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FREMONT UNIFIED DISTRICT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM WALLACE, in her official capacity as Fremont Unified School District Superintendent
Represented By: Seth Gordon Esquire
Represented By: Louis Leone Esquire
Represented By: Glenn Rothner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALLEY CENTER-PAUMA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSOCIATED CHINO TEACHERS
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAYWARD EDUCATION ASSOCIATION-CTA-NEA
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUSTIN EDUCATORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew John Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY FRANKLIN, in his official capacity as Tustin Unified School District Superintendent
Represented By: Mark Robert Bresee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON MCCOWAN, in his official capacity as Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District
Represented By: Jack M. Sleeth Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Shinoff Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT WAYNE, in his official capacity as Hayward Unified School District Superintendent
Represented By: Glenn Rothner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT CARPENTER
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA LEIGH-DICK
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUDREY STEWART
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGELA WILLIAMS, an individual, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETHANY MENDEZ
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER GRIBBEN, an individual
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE CHRISTIE, an individual
Represented By: Karin Sweigart
Represented By: James G. Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?