Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of Cwalt, Inc., alternative Loan Trust 2005-65CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-65CB, FKA Bank of New York
Defendant: SEVEN HILLS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION and ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Counter Claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Case Number: 20-15423
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (SL): These appeals remain stayed. A mediation status conference will be held on May 28, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time with counsel for BANA and SFR only. [11663491] [17-15803, 17-15829, 17-16570, 17-16713, 18-15341, 18-15583, 18-15600, 18-15703, 18-15811, 18-15812, 18-16057, 18-16070, 18-16420, 18-16457, 18-16619, 18-17095, 18-17113, 18-17389, 18-17392, 19-15143, 19-15223, 19-15235, 19-15279, 19-15280, 19-15282, 19-15490, 19-15548, 19-15711, 19-15724, 19-15787, 19-15854, 19-15890, 19-15901, 19-15907, 19-15919, 19-15923, 19-16151, 19-16342, 19-16110, 19-16886, 19-16997, 19-17034, 19-17125, 19-17172, 19-17225, 19-17525, 19-17527, 19-17564, 19-17587, 20-15019, 20-15112, 20-15205, 20-15423, 20-15470, 20-15497, 20-15499, 20-15501, 20-15602, 20-15608] (AF) [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:19 PM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/19/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11637238] (VS) [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:42 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11635346]. [20-15423] (AD) [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:44 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/19/2020. [11635279] [20-15423] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:53 AM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/19/2020. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 05/11/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/11/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11627385] (JBS) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVEN HILLS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of Cwalt, Inc., alternative Loan Trust 2005-65CB Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-65CB, FKA Bank of New York
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow Esquire
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?