Bank of America, N.A. v. T-Shack, Inc., et al
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC. and WESTTROP ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: T-SHACK, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., on behalf of BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Case Number: 20-15627
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 06/19/2020. See order for details. [11709605] (CL) [Entered: 06/03/2020 11:31 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/03/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/02/2020 ). [11698619] (CL) [Entered: 05/21/2020 06:36 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/02/2020, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 07/08/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 08/07/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11690304] (CL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:38 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/13/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11671060] (CL) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:46 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/16/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11663785]. [20-15627] (AD) [Entered: 04/17/2020 06:44 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/16/2020. [11663769] [20-15627] (Yergensen, Chris) [Entered: 04/16/2020 11:31 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain, Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15627. [11661525] (RR) [Entered: 04/15/2020 09:51 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11661296] [20-15627] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 04/15/2020 06:34 AM]
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/14/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11661091] [20-15627] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:12 PM]
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/16/2020. Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 06/08/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 07/07/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11656060] (JBS) [Entered: 04/09/2020 09:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. T-Shack, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: T-SHACK, INC.
Represented By: Chris V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., on behalf of BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Nicholas E. Belay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTTROP ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?