Bank of America, N.A. v. Airmotive Investments, LLC, et al
Defendant: WOODCREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION and ABSOLUTE COLLECTION SERVICES, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: AIRMOTIVE INVESTMENTS, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 20-15631
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/15/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11702766] (VS) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:52 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain, Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15631. [11661538] (RR) [Entered: 04/15/2020 09:56 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11661293] [20-15631] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 04/15/2020 06:31 AM]
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/14/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11661082] [20-15631] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:06 PM]
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/06/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11659279] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2020 02:03 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11658243]. [20-15631] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2020 06:44 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Airmotive Investments, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/10/2020. [11657964] [20-15631] (Croteau, Roger) [Entered: 04/10/2020 03:27 PM]
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Airmotive Investments, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/16/2020. Appellant Airmotive Investments, LLC opening brief due 06/17/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 07/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11656301] (RT) [Entered: 04/09/2020 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Airmotive Investments, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AIRMOTIVE INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy E. Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODCREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABSOLUTE COLLECTION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Tenesa Susan Powell
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?