Pablo Castellanos, et al v. MERS, et al
Defendant: ENCORE CREDIT CORPORATION, CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Defendant / Appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICING CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, BANK OF AMERICA, NA, named as Bank of America, National Association as Successor by Merger to LaSale Bank National Association, as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities ILLC, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-HE, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: PABLO A. CASTELLANOS and JUDITH T. CASTELLANOS, Occupants and Parties-In-Possession
Case Number: 20-15660
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 05/01/2020. [11680464] (RT) [Entered: 05/05/2020 08:01 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11661553] (CKP) [Entered: 04/15/2020 09:59 AM]
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Judith T. Castellanos and Pablo A. Castellanos opening brief due 06/22/2020. Appellees Bank of America, NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Quality Loan Servicing California Reconveyance Company and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. answering brief due 07/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11660617] (RT) [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pablo Castellanos, et al v. MERS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICING CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, NA, named as Bank of America, National Association as Successor by Merger to LaSale Bank National Association, as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities ILLC, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-HE
Represented By: Kim R. Lepore
Represented By: Joel F. Newell
Represented By: Jamin Stell Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Kim R. Lepore
Represented By: Joel F. Newell
Represented By: Jamin Stell Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Kim R. Lepore
Represented By: Joel F. Newell
Represented By: Jamin Stell Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PABLO A. CASTELLANOS
Represented By: Pablo A. Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUDITH T. CASTELLANOS, Occupants and Parties-In-Possession
Represented By: Judith T. Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCORE CREDIT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?