Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD, HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc., THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., THOMSON SA, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity, TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., HITACHI ASIA, LTD., SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V., PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA., TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V., SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA., PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED, HITACHI, LTD., MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD, TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. and HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Petitioner / Appellant: ELEANOR LEWIS, Proposed Intervenor
Case Number: 20-15704
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11671629]. [20-15704] (AD) [Entered: 04/24/2020 06:44 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Eleanor Lewis Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/24/2020. [11671180] [20-15704] (Kirkham, Tracy) [Entered: 04/24/2020 01:53 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Matthew Frutig for party(s) Appellee Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC Appellee Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. Appellee Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Appellee Toshiba America, Inc., in case 20-15704. [11670057] (CW) [Entered: 04/23/2020 03:00 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew Frutig (White & Case LLP 701 Thirteenth Street, NW Washington, District of Columbia 20005-3807) for Appellees Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. Date of service: 04/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11669874] [20-15704] (Frutig, Matthew) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:45 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 Terminated John Roberti for Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Thomson SA, Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Philips do Brasil Ltda., Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Corporation, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd. and Hitachi America, Ltd in 20-15704 [11667016] (CW) [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:44 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) John Roberti for party(s) Appellee Hitachi Asia, Ltd. Appellee Panasonic Corporation of North America Appellee Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC Appellee Philips Koninklijke N.V. Appellee MT Picture Display Co., LTD Appellee Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda. Appellee Samsung SDI America, Inc. Appellee Toshiba America, Inc. Appellee Hitachi Displays, Ltd. Appellee Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc. Appellee Hitachi, Ltd. Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation Appellee Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD Appellee Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Appellee Thomson SA Appellee Panasonic Corporation Appellee Philips Taiwan Limited Appellee Toshiba Corporation Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Appellee Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Appellee Philips do Brasil Ltda. Appellee Hitachi America, Ltd Appellee Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Appellee Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. Appellee Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. Appellee Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V. Appellee Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., in case 20-15704. [11666881] (CW) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:43 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Roberti (Allen & Overy LLP, 1101 New York Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Substitution for Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Date of service: 04/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11666866] [20-15704] (Roberti, John) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:40 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Attorneys Gary Halling, Gary Halling, Gary Halling, Gary Halling, Gary Halling, Gary Halling and Gary Halling in 20-15704 substituted by Attorneys Andrew Rhys Davies, Andrew Rhys Davies, Andrew Rhys Davies, Andrew Rhys Davies, Andrew Rhys Davies, Andrew Rhys Davies and Andrew Rhys Davies in 20-15704 [11666860] (CW) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:38 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Rhys Davies (Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020) for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Substitution for Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Date of service: 04/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11666840] [20-15704] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:30 AM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Eleanor Lewis Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/24/2020. Transcript ordered by 05/15/2020. Transcript due 06/15/2020. Appellant Eleanor Lewis opening brief due 07/24/2020. Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 08/24/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11664590] (RT) [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Martin C. Geagan
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON SA
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ASIA, LTD.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD
Represented By: Martin C. Geagan
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Mario Alioto
Represented By: Sylvie Kern
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rosenberg Esquire
Represented By: Lauren C. Capurro
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ELEANOR LEWIS, Proposed Intervenor
Represented By: John Bogdanov
Represented By: Tracy Rena Kirkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?