Bank of New York Mellon v. Smoke Ranch Maintenance Dist., et al
Cross Defendant: E TRADE BANK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., as Nominee Beneficiary on behalf of Realty Mortgage Corporation and JOAN GLORIA BOHNET LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2, 2004
Defendant / Appellee: RED ROCK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC and SMOKE RANCH MAINTENANCE DISTRICT
Appellant: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, Not Individually but Solely as Trustee for the Holders of the Bear Stearns Alt-A Trust 2004-11, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 200, FKA The Bank of New York
Counter Claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Case Number: 20-15838
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED -DIAL-IN; FurtherConference, 07/08/2020, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11722259] [20-15702, 20-15838] (VS) [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:29 PM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on June 10, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. The cross-appeal briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: first cross-appeal brief for SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC is due July 15, 2020; second cross-appeal brief for Bank of New York Mellon is due August 14, 2020; third cross-appeal brief for Red Rock Financial Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Smoke Ranch Maintenance District is due September 14, 2020; optional cross-appeal reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the third cross-appeal brief. [11704401] [20-15702, 20-15838] (AF) [Entered: 05/28/2020 04:16 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 05/28/2020, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11691574] [20-15702, 20-15838] (VS) [Entered: 05/14/2020 05:31 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11690307]. [20-15838] (AD) [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:44 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Bank of New York Mellon in 20-15838 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/13/2020. [11689891] [20-15838, 20-15702]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 20-15838 only.] (SLM) [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:18 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 3 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Bank of New York Mellon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/13/2020. [11689860] [20-15838] (Lancaster, Aaron) [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:03 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Bank of New York Mellon Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/11/2020. First cross appeal brief due 06/15/2020 for SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/15/2020 for Bank of New York Mellon. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/14/2020 for Red Rock Financial Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Smoke Ranch Maintenance District. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11679084] [20-15838, 20-15702] (JBS) [Entered: 05/04/2020 09:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Smoke Ranch Maintenance Dist., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: E TRADE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., as Nominee Beneficiary on behalf of Realty Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: JOAN GLORIA BOHNET LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2, 2004
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RED ROCK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: David Richard Koch
Represented By: Steven Bradley Scow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SMOKE RANCH MAINTENANCE DISTRICT
Represented By: Marc Steven Cwik Esquire
Represented By: Adam J. Pernsteiner Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, Not Individually but Solely as Trustee for the Holders of the Bear Stearns Alt-A Trust 2004-11, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 200, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Represented By: Aaron D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?