City of Oakland v. Oakland Raiders, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DETROIT LIONS, INC., PANTHERS FOOTBALL, LLC, NEW ORLEANS LOUISIANA SAINTS, LLC, CHICAGO BEARS FOOTBALL CLUB, INC., HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, LP, FOOTBALL NORTHWEST LLC, PITTSBURGH STEELERS LLC, CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC, KANSAS CITY CHIEFS FOOTBALL CLUB, INC., CHARGERS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC, CINCINNATI BENGALS, INC., NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS, INC., INDIANAPOLIS COLTS, INC., THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC, BUCCANEERS TEAM LLC, MINNESOTA VIKINGS FOOTBALL LLC, PDB SPORTS LTD., ARIZONA CARDINALS FOOTBALL CLUB, LLC, TENNESSEE FOOTBALL, INC., BALTIMORE RAVENS, LP, GREEN BAY PACKERS, INC., DALLAS COWBOYS FOOTBALL CLUB, LTD., PRO-FOOTBALL, INC., NEW YORK JETS, LLC, FORTY NINERS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC, OAKLAND RAIDERS, a California Limited Partnership, JACKSONVILLE JAGUARS LLC, PHILADELPHIA EAGLES LLC, NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, BUFFALO BILLS, LLC, NEW ENGLAND PATRIOTS LLC, MIAMI DOLPHINS, LTD. and ATLANTA FALCONS FOOTBALL CLUB LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CITY OF OAKLAND
Case Number: 20-16075
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11751502] (BLS) [Entered: 07/13/2020 05:50 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/25/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11719478] (BLS) [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:04 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/08/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11715116]. [20-16075] (AD) [Entered: 06/08/2020 06:44 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant City of Oakland Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/08/2020. [11714274] [20-16075] (Simon, Bruce) [Entered: 06/08/2020 12:47 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant City of Oakland Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/29/2020. Transcript due 07/28/2020. Appellant City of Oakland opening brief due 09/08/2020. Appellees Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens, LP, Buccaneers Team LLC, Buffalo Bills, LLC, Chargers Football Company LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company, LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Forty Niners Football Company LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets, LLC, Oakland Raiders, PDB Sports Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., Tennessee Football, Inc. and The Rams Football Company, LLC answering brief due 10/08/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11707069] (JBS) [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City of Oakland v. Oakland Raiders, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETROIT LIONS, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANTHERS FOOTBALL, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW ORLEANS LOUISIANA SAINTS, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHICAGO BEARS FOOTBALL CLUB, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOUSTON NFL HOLDINGS, LP
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FOOTBALL NORTHWEST LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PITTSBURGH STEELERS LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEVELAND BROWNS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KANSAS CITY CHIEFS FOOTBALL CLUB, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARGERS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CINCINNATI BENGALS, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW YORK FOOTBALL GIANTS, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDIANAPOLIS COLTS, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE RAMS FOOTBALL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUCCANEERS TEAM LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MINNESOTA VIKINGS FOOTBALL LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PDB SPORTS LTD.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIZONA CARDINALS FOOTBALL CLUB, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TENNESSEE FOOTBALL, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BALTIMORE RAVENS, LP
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREEN BAY PACKERS, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALLAS COWBOYS FOOTBALL CLUB, LTD.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRO-FOOTBALL, INC.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW YORK JETS, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FORTY NINERS FOOTBALL COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OAKLAND RAIDERS, a California Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Jonathan Ian Gleklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACKSONVILLE JAGUARS LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILADELPHIA EAGLES LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUFFALO BILLS, LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW ENGLAND PATRIOTS LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIAMI DOLPHINS, LTD.
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATLANTA FALCONS FOOTBALL CLUB LLC
Represented By: Gregg H. Levy Esquire
Represented By: Sean Franklin Howell
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CITY OF OAKLAND
Represented By: Barbara Jean Parker
Represented By: Daniel Leon Warshaw Esquire
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: Thomas Jerome Nolan Esquire
Represented By: Benjamin Ernest Shiftan
Represented By: Jenny H. Kim
Represented By: Emily Burgess
Represented By: Matthew A. Pearson
Represented By: Erin Bernstein
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Represented By: Clifford Harris Pearson Esquire
Represented By: Michael Matthew Fay Esquire
Represented By: Maria Bee
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?