Blanca Orellana v. Chad Wolf, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of Homeland Security and JOHN KRAMAR, San Francisco/San Jose District Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: BLANCA ESTELLA ORELLANA
Case Number: 20-16092
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 Added Attorney Tashiba Monique Peoples Appellees Chad F. Wolf , John Kramar and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, in case 20-16092. [11772401] (HH) [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:31 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tashiba Monique Peoples (U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Immigration Litigation - District Court Section, Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 868, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 07/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11772371] [20-16092] (Peoples, Tashiba) [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:18 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 06/19/2020. [11728668] (RT) [Entered: 06/22/2020 08:36 AM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Blanca Estella Orellana response to Court order dated 06/10/2020. Date of service: 06/19/2020. [11727667] [20-16092] (Crabtree, Kevin) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:49 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11727661]. [20-16092] (AD) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:44 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Blanca Estella Orellana Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/19/2020. [11727069] [20-16092] (Crabtree, Kevin) [Entered: 06/19/2020 07:52 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11720547] (LW) [Entered: 06/12/2020 02:50 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11717576] (TSP) [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:31 PM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Blanca Estella Orellana Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/10/2020. Appellant Blanca Estella Orellana opening brief due 08/10/2020. Appellees Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar and Chad F. Wolf answering brief due 09/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11710158] (RT) [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Blanca Orellana v. Chad Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kimberly Robinson
Represented By: Tashiba Monique Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kimberly Robinson
Represented By: Tashiba Monique Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN KRAMAR, San Francisco/San Jose District Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Kimberly Robinson
Represented By: Tashiba Monique Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BLANCA ESTELLA ORELLANA
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?