Twitter, Inc. v. William Barr, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: TWITTER, INC.
Case Number: 20-16174
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11770023] (CL) [Entered: 07/28/2020 06:48 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant Twitter, Inc. Correspondence: Notice Regarding Certificate - Appellant notifies this Court that no transcripts will be ordered because the cross-motions for summary judgment immediately underlying this appeal were decided on the papers and therefore no transcript exists. Date of service: 07/15/2020 [11753577] [20-16174] (Rubin, Lee) [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:36 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Julia Alexandra Heiman in 20-16174 substituted by Attorney Lewis Yelin in 20-16174 [11747276] (QDL) [Entered: 07/09/2020 11:33 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lewis Stanley Yelin (Appellate Staff, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellees William P. Barr, FBI, USDOJ and Christopher Wray. Substitution for Attorney Julia Alexandra Heiman for Appellees William P. Barr, FBI, USDOJ and Christopher Wray. Date of service: 07/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11747111] [20-16174] (Yelin, Lewis) [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:29 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/13/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11736291] (CL) [Entered: 06/29/2020 11:22 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/23/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11730727]. [20-16174] (AD) [Entered: 06/23/2020 12:44 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Twitter, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2020. [11730547] [20-16174] (Rubin, Lee) [Entered: 06/23/2020 11:13 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Twitter, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/23/2020. Transcript ordered by 07/15/2020. Transcript due 08/14/2020. Appellant Twitter, Inc. opening brief due 09/23/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and Christopher Wray answering brief due 10/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11723946] (JBS) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Twitter, Inc. v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Heiman
Represented By: Lewis Yelin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WRAY, Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Heiman
Represented By: Lewis Yelin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Heiman
Represented By: Lewis Yelin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Julia Alexandra Heiman
Represented By: Lewis Yelin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TWITTER, INC.
Represented By: Lee H. Rubin
Represented By: Donald Manwell Falk
Represented By: Samantha Booth
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?