James Denby, et al v. David Engstrom, et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH J. TORRES
Defendant: COUNTY OF PINAL and CITY OF CASA GRANDE
Plaintiff / Appellee: JAMES W. DENBY and WILMA J. LOGSTON
Defendant / Appellant: RORY SKEDEL, JANE DOE LAPRE, JANE DOE ROBINSON, JACOB H. ROBINSON, DAVID ENGSTROM, JANE DOE ENGSTROM, JANE DOE GREGG, CHRISTOPHER LAPRE, GREGG, Sgt. and JANE DOE SKEDEL
Case Number: 20-16319
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 9, 2021 JAMES DENBY V. DAVID ENGSTROM

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11804760] (VS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:12 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due October 14, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due November 13, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11773087] (AF) [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:18 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/27/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11772974] (VS) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:41 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/29/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11754077] (VS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:18 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11753825]. [20-16319] (AD) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:44 PM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Engstrom, Jane Doe Engstrom, Gregg, Jane Doe Gregg, Christopher Lapre, Jane Doe Lapre, Jacob H. Robinson, Jane Doe Robinson, Jane Doe Skedel and Rory Skedel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/15/2020. [11753533] [20-16319] (Jellison, James) [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:17 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants David Engstrom, Jane Doe Engstrom, Gregg, Jane Doe Gregg, Christopher Lapre, Jane Doe Lapre, Jacob H. Robinson, Jane Doe Robinson, Jane Doe Skedel and Rory Skedel Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/15/2020. Appellants David Engstrom, Jane Doe Engstrom, Gregg, Jane Doe Gregg, Christopher Lapre, Jane Doe Lapre, Jacob H. Robinson, Jane Doe Robinson, Jane Doe Skedel and Rory Skedel opening brief due 09/14/2020. Appellees James W. Denby and Wilma J. Logston answering brief due 10/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11746127] (RT) [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Denby, et al v. David Engstrom, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES W. DENBY
Represented By: Robert T. Mills
Represented By: Sean Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILMA J. LOGSTON
Represented By: Robert T. Mills
Represented By: Sean Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RORY SKEDEL
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE DOE LAPRE
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE DOE ROBINSON
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JACOB H. ROBINSON
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID ENGSTROM
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE DOE ENGSTROM
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE DOE GREGG
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTOPHER LAPRE
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GREGG, Sgt.
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE DOE SKEDEL
Represented By: James M. Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF PINAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CASA GRANDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH J. TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?