Kristin Perry, et al v. Dennis Hollingsworth, et al
Defendant: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles and PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
Plaintiff / Appellee: KRISTIN M. PERRY, PAUL T. KATAMI, SANDRA B. STIER and JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Defendant / Appellee: GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor, XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General, MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics and LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: GAIL J. KNIGHT, MARK A. JANSSON, DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH and MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ
Intervenor Plaintiff: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Intervenor / Appellee: KQED, INC.
Amicus Curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS and 32 MEDIA ORGANIZATIONS
Case Number: 20-16375
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 20 ] and the excerpts of record [ # 21 ] submitted by Appellants are filed. The amicus brief [ # 10 ] submitted by Amici Curiae 32 Media Organizations and Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press is filed. Within 7 days of this order, the filer of each brief is ordered to file 6 copies of that brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. The Form 18 certificate is available on the Court's website at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/forms/form18.pdf . The covers of the opening brief must be blue. The covers of the amicus brief must be green. Within 7 days of this order, the filer of each set of excerpts of record is ordered to file 3 copies of that set of excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. The address for regular U.S. mail is P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939. The address for overnight mail is 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, CA 94103-1526. [11817666] (SML) [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:31 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight. Date of service: 09/09/2020. [11817599] [20-16375] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:57 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 20 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight. Date of service: 09/09/2020. [11817590] [20-16375] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:52 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Jeremy Michael Goldman, Esquire for Appellee City and County of San Francisco response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 08/21/2020. [11798272] [20-16375] (Goldman, Jeremy) [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:27 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. John D. Ohlendorf for Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 08/21/2020. [11797448] [20-16375] (Ohlendorf, John) [Entered: 08/21/2020 06:07 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Thomas R. Burke, Esquire for Appellee KQED, Inc. response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 08/20/2020. [11797156] [20-16375] (Burke, Thomas) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:28 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Christopher Dean Dusseault for Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 08/19/2020. [11794927] [20-16375] (Dusseault, Christopher) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:30 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San Francisco Please review the San Francisco sitting dates for December 2020 and the 2 subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please file # Form 32 within 3 business days of this notice using the CM/ECF filing type Response to Case Being Considered for Oral Argument . Please follow the form's # instructions carefully. When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 business days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[11793554]. [20-16375] (AW) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:02 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, MARY M. SCHROEDER and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN): The motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief in support of appellee KQED, Inc.s opposition to the motion for a stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall file the amici curiae brief submitted on July 27, 2020. In response to appellants motion to stay the district courts July 9, 2020 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]), we grant a temporary stay of the order to preserve the status quo pending consideration of the appeal on the merits.1 See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418, 433-34 (2009); cf. Al Otro Lado v. Wolf, 945 F.3d 1223, 1224 (9th Cir. 2019). We sua sponte expedite the appeal. Appellants opening brief and excerpts of record are due September 9, 2020. Appellees answering briefs are due October 9, 2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(1). No written motions for extensions of time under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) will be granted absent extraordinary and compelling circumstances. The Clerk shall place this appeal on the calendar for December 2020. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(f). [11785233] (AF) [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:13 PM]
August 1, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 08/01/2020. [11774023] [20-16375] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/01/2020 06:31 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 32 Media Organizations. [11771812] (QDL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 11:07 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 32 Media Organizations Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 07/29/2020. [11770615] [20-16375] (Townsend, KatieLynn) [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:52 AM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 32 Media Organizations. Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11768103] [20-16375] (Townsend, KatieLynn) [Entered: 07/27/2020 04:52 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11767845] [20-16375] (Goldman, Jeremy) [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:37 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11767449] [20-16375] (Olson, Theodore) [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:50 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellees Xavier Becerra, Mark B. Horton, Gavin Newsom and Linette Scott response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11767314] [20-16375] (Goldstein, Seth) [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:16 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee KQED, Inc. response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/27/2020. [11767061] [20-16375] (Burke, Thomas) [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:44 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. [11756657] (VS) [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:34 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/17/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11756080]. [20-16375] (AD) [Entered: 07/17/2020 06:44 AM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Gail J. Knight, Mark A. Jansson, Dennis Hollingsworth and Martin F. Gutierrez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/17/2020. [11756064] [20-16375] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 07/17/2020 05:51 AM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight Urgent Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 07/16/2020. [11755480] [20-16375] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:08 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/23/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/13/2020. Transcript due 09/14/2020. Appellants Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson and Gail J. Knight opening brief due 10/22/2020. Appellees Xavier Becerra, City and County of San Francisco, Mark B. Horton, KQED, Inc., Paul T. Katami, Gavin Newsom, Kristin M. Perry, Linette Scott, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo answering brief due 11/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11755419] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kristin Perry, et al v. Dennis Hollingsworth, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KRISTIN M. PERRY
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Matthew McGill
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson Esquire
Represented By: Amir C. Tayrani
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL T. KATAMI
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Matthew McGill
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson Esquire
Represented By: Amir C. Tayrani
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SANDRA B. STIER
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Matthew McGill
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson Esquire
Represented By: Amir C. Tayrani
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Represented By: Christopher D. Dusseault
Represented By: Matthew McGill
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson Esquire
Represented By: Amir C. Tayrani
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Seth Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Seth Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Seth Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Seth Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: GAIL J. KNIGHT
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Thompson
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Andrew P. Pugno
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: MARK A. JANSSON
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Thompson
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Andrew P. Pugno
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Thompson
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Andrew P. Pugno
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David Thompson
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Andrew P. Pugno
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Goldman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: KQED, INC.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 32 MEDIA ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?