Raymond Collette v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: SANDOZ, INC., WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and EON LABS, INC., FKA Eon Labs Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: RAYMOND J. COLLETTE
Case Number: 20-16406
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11812302] (CL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:59 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/26/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11787251] (CL) [Entered: 08/12/2020 07:44 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Lindsey C. Boney IV for party(s) Appellee Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., in case 20-16406. [11778204] (CW) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:29 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lindsey C Boney IV (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203) for Appellee Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Date of service: 08/05/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11777982] [20-16406] (Boney, Lindsey) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:08 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Karin Bohmholdt for party(s) Appellee Eon Labs, Inc. Appellee Sandoz, Inc., in case 20-16406. [11772973] (CW) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:40 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Karin B. Bohmholdt (Greenberg Traurig, LLP, 1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees Eon Labs, Inc. and Sandoz, Inc.. Date of service: 07/31/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11772934] [20-16406] (Bohmholdt, Karin) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:20 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Sara Kristine Thompson for party(s) Appellee Eon Labs, Inc. Appellee Sandoz, Inc., in case 20-16406. [11772923] (CW) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:16 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sara K. Thompson (Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Terminus 200, 3333 Piedmont Road NE, Suite 2500, Atlanta, Georgia 30305) for Appellees Sandoz, Inc. and Eon Labs, Inc.. Date of service: 07/31/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11772882] [20-16406] (Thompson, Sara) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:03 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/29/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11770708]. [20-16406] (AD) [Entered: 07/29/2020 12:44 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Raymond J. Collette Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/29/2020. [11770270] [20-16406] (Mansfield, Alan) [Entered: 07/29/2020 09:48 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Terminated Thomas Alexander Cierny for Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in 20-16406 due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11762406] (RY) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:05 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raymond J. Collette Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/29/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/20/2020. Transcript due 09/21/2020. Appellant Raymond J. Collette opening brief due 10/29/2020. Appellees Eon Labs, Inc., Sandoz, Inc. and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answering brief due 11/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11761686] (JBS) [Entered: 07/22/2020 09:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Raymond Collette v. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Represented By: Sara Kristine Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Brooke Leanne Killian Kim
Represented By: Jeanette T. Barzelay
Represented By: George Gigounas
Represented By: Lindsey C. Boney IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EON LABS, INC., FKA Eon Labs Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Natassia Kwan
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Represented By: Sara Kristine Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAYMOND J. COLLETTE
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Represented By: Edward Kirksey Wood Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?