WhatsApp Inc., et al v. NSO Group Technologies Ltd., et al
Defendant / Appellant: NSO GROUP TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED and Q CYBER TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Plaintiff / Appellee: WHATSAPP INC., a Delaware corporation, FACEBOOK INC., a Delaware corporation and FACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation
Amicus Curiae: MICROSOFT CORPORATION, ACCESS NOW, CISCO SYSTEMS, INC., AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL, GITHUB, INC., COMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS, GOOGLE LLC, INTERNET FREEDOM FOUNDATION, LINKEDIN CORPORATION, PRIVACY INTERNATIONAL, VMWARE, INC., RED EN DEFENSA DE LOS DERECHOS DIGITALES, INTERNET ASSOCIATION, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITY SCHOLARS and DAVID KAYE
Case Number: 20-16408
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 71 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [12072508] (BJK) [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:47 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 70 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO MARY H. MURGUIA, RYAN D. NELSON and DANIELLE J. HUNSAKER. [12070769] (ORW) [Entered: 04/12/2021 12:14 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 69 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey S. Bucholtz, Esquire for Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. Hearing in San Francisco on 04/12/2021 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 03/19/2021. [12047620] [20-16408] (Bucholtz, Jeffrey) [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:03 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 68 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Michael R. Dreeben for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Hearing in San Francisco on 04/12/2021 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 03/19/2021. [12047524] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 03/19/2021 12:16 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 67 Received 6 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 65 ] filed by NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. (sent to panel) [11998154] (SD) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:07 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 66 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 65 ] submitted by NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11995629] (LA) [Entered: 02/08/2021 09:59 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 65 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. Date of service: 02/05/2021. [11995146] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 02/05/2021 07:22 PM]
January 31, 2021 Filing 64 Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, April 12, 2021 - 09:30 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - Scheduled Location: San Francisco CA. The hearing time is the local time zone at the scheduled hearing location, even if the argument is fully remote. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . NOTE: Although your case is currently scheduled for oral argument, the panel may decide to submit the case on the briefs instead. See Fed. R. App. P. 34. Absent further order of the court, if the court does determine that oral argument is required in this case, any argument may be held remotely with all of the judges and attorneys appearing by video or telephone. Travel to a courthouse will not be required. If the panel determines that it will hold oral argument, the Clerk's Office will be in contact with you directly at least two weeks before the set argument date to make any necessary arrangements for remote appearance. Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to be available (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Monday, April 12, 2021. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11987067]. [20-16408] (AW) [Entered: 01/31/2021 06:12 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 63 Terminated Ephraim A. McDowell for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. [11967324] (DJV) [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:53 AM]
January 16, 2021 Filing 62 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Ephraim A. McDowell for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/16/2021. [11966748] [20-16408] (McDowell, Ephraim) [Entered: 01/16/2021 01:45 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 61 Terminated Alec Schierenbeck for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. [11963565] (DJV) [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:39 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 60 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Alec Schierenbeck for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/14/2021. [11963426] [20-16408] (Schierenbeck, Alec) [Entered: 01/14/2021 09:46 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 59 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Foreign Sovereign Immunity Scholars reply to response (). Date of service: 01/08/2021. [11957188] [20-16408] (Klineberg, Geoffrey) [Entered: 01/08/2021 01:20 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) Amici Curiae - Pending Access Now, Amnesty International, Committee to Protect Journalists, Internet Freedom Foundation, Privacy International, Red en Defensa de los Derechos Digitales and Reporters Without Borders reply to response (). Date of service: 01/07/2021. [11955447] [20-16408] (McLorg, Kyle) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:23 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 57 Filed (ECF) Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited response to motion ([ # 46 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 46 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 47 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 47 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 01/04/2021. [11951532] [20-16408]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected response. 01/04/2021 by SLM] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:21 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 56 Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 51 ] filed by David Kaye. [11947623] (SD) [Entered: 12/29/2020 01:50 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 55 Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 37 ] filed by Microsoft Corporation, Cisco Systems, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Google LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, VMware, Inc., and Internet Association. [11946469] (SD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:39 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 54 COURT CORRECTION per notice at entry [44]: Terminated Ian R. Shapiro for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. in 20-16408, Kyle Christopher Wong for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. in 20-16408, Michael Graham Rhodes for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. in 20-16408 [11946007] (SLM) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:04 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 53 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 51 ] submitted by David Kaye is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11938833] (KWG) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:32 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 52 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae David Kaye. [11938831] (KWG) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:31 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 51 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by David Kaye. Date of service: 12/23/2020. [11938799] [20-16408] (Goldenberg, Elaine) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:17 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 50 Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 41 ] filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. [11938733] (SD) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:55 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 49 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Foreign Sovereign Immunity Scholars. [11938336] (KWG) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:43 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 48 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Access Now, Amnesty International, Committee to Protect Journalists, Internet Freedom Foundation, Privacy International, Red en Defensa de los Derechos Digitales and Reporters Without Borders. [11938330] (KWG) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:39 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 47 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Foreign Sovereign Immunity Scholars. Date of service: 12/23/2020. [11938264] [20-16408] (Klineberg, Geoffrey) [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:04 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 46 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Access Now, Amnesty International, Committee to Protect Journalists, Internet Freedom Foundation, Paradigm Initiative, Privacy International, Red en Defensa de los Derechos Digitales, and Reporters Without Borders. Date of service: 12/23/2020. [11938143] [20-16408] (McLorg, Kyle) [Entered: 12/23/2020 11:20 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 45 Terminated Elizabeth Prelogar for WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc. [11937358] (RL) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:42 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 44 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Elizabeth Prelogar for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc., Mr. Michael Graham Rhodes, Esquire for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc., Ian R. Shapiro for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. and Kyle Christopher Wong, Esquire for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11937347] [20-16408] (Wong, Kyle) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:39 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 43 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 41 ] submitted by Electronic Frontier Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11936223] (LA) [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:35 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 42 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation. [11936221] (LA) [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:34 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 41 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Date of service: 12/21/2020. [11935774] [20-16408] (Cope, Sophia) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:59 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 40 Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 32 ] filed by Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. [11935465] (SD) [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:16 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 39 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 37 ] submitted by Microsoft Corporation, Cisco Systems, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Google LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, VMware, Inc., and Internet Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11935339] (LA) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:40 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 38 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Microsoft Corporation, Cisco Systems, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Google LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, VMware, Inc., and Internet Association. [11935338] (LA) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:39 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 37 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Microsoft Corporation, Cisco Systems, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Google LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, VMware, Inc., and Internet Association. Date of service: 12/21/2020. [11935084] [20-16408] (Parris, Mark) [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:19 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 36 Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Jeffrey S. Bucholtz, Esquire for Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 12/21/2020. [11934893] [20-16408] (Bucholtz, Jeffrey) [Entered: 12/21/2020 12:08 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 35 Streamlined request [34] by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 02/05/2021. [11931481] (DLM) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:15 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. New requested due date is 02/05/2021. [11931147] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:56 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 33 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 32 ] submitted by Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11930903] (KWG) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:23 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 32 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees WhatsApp Inc. and Facebook Inc.. Date of service: 12/16/2020. [11930616] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:11 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 31 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San Francisco Please review the San Francisco sitting dates for April 2021 and the 2 subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please file # Form 32 within 3 business days of this notice using the CM/ECF filing type Response to Case Being Considered for Oral Argument . Please follow the form's # instructions carefully. When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 business days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[11930585]. [20-16408] (AW) [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:01 PM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 30 Added Attorney Yaira Dubin for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc., in case 20-16408. [11924870] (HH) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:34 PM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Yaira Dubin (O'Melveny & Myers LLP 7 Times Square New York, NY 10036) for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Date of service: 12/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11924197] [20-16408] (Dubin, Yaira) [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:35 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 24 ] filed by NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. [11900243] (SD) [Entered: 11/19/2020 05:36 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 27 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 25 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. [11899303] (LA) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:46 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 26 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 24 ] submitted by NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 25 ] submitted by NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11895384] (LA) [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:33 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11895029] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 11/16/2020 07:02 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11895020] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:53 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 Added Attorney(s) Jeffrey S. Bucholtz for party(s) Appellant NSO Group Technologies Limited Appellant Q Cyber Technologies Limited, in case 20-16408. [11893478] (CW) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:41 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey S. Bucholtz (King & Spalding LLP, 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 200, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. Date of service: 11/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11893416] [20-16408] (Bucholtz, Jeffrey) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:04 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SC): The court has received the parties correspondence regarding a priority hearing date (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 19 ] and [ # 20 ]). The Clerk will place this matter on the next available calendar upon the completion of briefing. [11880899] (AF) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:05 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant NSO Group Technologies Limited Correspondence: Responding to Appellees' letter erroneously representing that this appeal is "entitled to priority in hearing date.". Date of service: 10/30/2020 [11877193] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 10/30/2020 01:08 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. Correspondence: Informing the Court that pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 34-3, this appeal is "entitled to priority in hearing date.". Date of service: 10/29/2020 [11875918] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:40 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON): Appellees motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (Docket Entry No. [ # 13 ]) is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Natl Indus. v. Republic Natl Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). The opening brief and excerpts of record are due November 16, 2020; the answering brief is due December 16, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11862089] (AF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:43 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/01/2020. [11843990] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:13 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/30/2020. [11842291] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:57 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. reply to response (motion to dismiss the case, ). Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11838781] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:57 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited response to motion ([ # 13 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 13 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/21/2020. [11831662] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:31 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821187] [20-16408] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:52 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Added Attorney Alec Schierenbeck for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc., in case 20-16408. [11821152] (HH) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:39 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alec Schierenbeck (O'Melveny & Myers LLP 7 Times Square New York, NY 10036) for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11821148] [20-16408] (Schierenbeck, Alec) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:38 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney Ephraim A. McDowell for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc., in case 20-16408. [11821135] (HH) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:34 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ephraim McDowell (O'Melveny & Myers LLP 1625 Eye Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc.. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11821108] [20-16408] (McDowell, Ephraim) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:26 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited opening brief due 10/21/2020. Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. answering brief due 11/20/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11818999] (DLM) [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:02 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited. New requested due date is 10/21/2020. [11818792] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:41 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11794846] (VS) [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:44 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/19/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11774422] (VS) [Entered: 08/03/2020 09:20 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/30/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11772569]. [20-16408] (AD) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:44 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/30/2020. [11772291] [20-16408] (Akrotirianakis, Joseph) [Entered: 07/30/2020 03:34 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11772212] (LW) [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:56 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/29/2020. Appellants NSO Group Technologies Limited and Q Cyber Technologies Limited opening brief due 09/21/2020. Appellees Facebook Inc. and WhatsApp Inc. answering brief due 10/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11761779] (JBS) [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: WhatsApp Inc., et al v. NSO Group Technologies Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NSO GROUP TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Akrotirianakis
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Q CYBER TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Akrotirianakis
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WHATSAPP INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong Esquire
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth Prelogar
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Marques
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Micah Block
Represented By: Ian R. Shapiro
Represented By: Ephraim A. McDowell
Represented By: Alec Schierenbeck
Represented By: Yaira Dubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FACEBOOK INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong Esquire
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth Prelogar
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Marques
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Micah Block
Represented By: Ian R. Shapiro
Represented By: Ephraim A. McDowell
Represented By: Alec Schierenbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Yaira Dubin
Represented By: Micah Block
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Antonio Perez-Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACCESS NOW
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GITHUB, INC.
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNET FREEDOM FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINKEDIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PRIVACY INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VMWARE, INC.
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RED EN DEFENSA DE LOS DERECHOS DIGITALES
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNET ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Mark Parris
Represented By: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS
Represented By: Kyle Andrew McLorg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Sophia Sabrina Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FOREIGN SOVEREIGN IMMUNITY SCHOLARS
Represented By: Geoffrey Morris Klineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID KAYE
Represented By: Elaine Goldenberg Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?