Curtis Chun v. City and County of Honolulu, et al
Defendant: DOE GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES, 1-10, JOHN DOES, 1-10, JANE DOES, 1-10 and DOE CORPORATIONS, 1-10
Plaintiff / Appellant: CURTIS CHUN
Defendant / Appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU
Case Number: 20-16558
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11836342] (CL) [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:56 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/16/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 10:00 a.m. PT ). [11819222] (MS) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:56 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Nicolette Winter for party(s) Appellee City and County of Honolulu. [11813010] (RL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:45 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nicolette Winter (Department of the Corporation Counsel, City and County of Honolulu, 530 S. King Street, Suite 110, Honolulu, Hawaii 96813) for Appellee City and County of Honolulu. Date of service: 09/03/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11812967] [20-16558] (Winter, Nicolette) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:33 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Robert M. Kohn for party(s) Appellee City and County of Honolulu. [11812760] (RL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:35 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert M. Kohn (Department of the Corporation Counsel, City and County of Honolulu, 530 S. King Street, Suite 110, Honolulu, Hawaii 96813) for Appellee City and County of Honolulu. Date of service: 09/03/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11812751] [20-16558] (Kohn, Robert) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:30 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/16/2020, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11812510] (CL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:57 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11797456]. [20-16558] (AD) [Entered: 08/21/2020 06:44 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Curtis Chun Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/20/2020. [11797440] [20-16558] (Luiz, Shawn) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:56 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Curtis Chun Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/20/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/11/2020. Transcript due 10/13/2020. Appellant Curtis Chun opening brief due 11/20/2020. Appellee City and County of Honolulu answering brief due 12/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11788131] (RT) [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Curtis Chun v. City and County of Honolulu, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE CORPORATIONS, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CURTIS CHUN
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Luiz Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU
Represented By: Tracy Sanae Fukui Esquire
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?