Vilaychith Khouanmany v. Paul Penzone, et al
Defendant / Appellee: P. TORRES, Secretary, FPC-Phoenix, COPELAND, Ms., Case Manager, FPC-Phoenix, PAUL PENZONE, Sheriff of Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Jail Commander, Estrella Jail, V. GUTIERREZ, Secretary at FCI-Dublin, WILLIAM W. LOTHROP, Warden-FPC-Phoenix, E. JIMENEZ, Mr., Counselor, FPC-Phoenix, UNKNOWN PARTIES, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, MICHEAL CARVAJAL, Federal Bureau of Prisons Director, CHARLESTON C. IWUAGWU, Warden at FCI-Dublin and PERKS, Jail Commander at Estrella Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: VILAYCHITH KHOUANMANY
Case Number: 20-16594
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Vilaychith Khouanmany motion to addendum to defendant's action against Plaintiff. Deficiencies: None. [11835734] (NAC) [Entered: 09/24/2020 01:18 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/17/2020. 1) Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 58 ) is denied. (2) This case must remain closed. (3) The Clerk of Court must transmit a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in connection with Appeal No. 20-16594. [11828854] (NAC) [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:59 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Received copy of motion filed in district court re: Motion to Seal Fear of Retaliation/Injury, MOTION to Amend 56 Notice of Appeal - Amended, 50 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Motion filed by Appellant Vilaychith Khouanmany. [11824830] (NAC) [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:46 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11812826] (CKP) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:52 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/31/2020. [11811788] (NAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 07:11 AM]
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11805752] (NAC) [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:50 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11796635] (CKP) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:42 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Vilaychith Khouanmany opening brief due 10/22/2020. [11794792] (RT) [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vilaychith Khouanmany v. Paul Penzone, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P. TORRES, Secretary, FPC-Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COPELAND, Ms., Case Manager, FPC-Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL PENZONE, Sheriff of Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Jail Commander, Estrella Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: V. GUTIERREZ, Secretary at FCI-Dublin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM W. LOTHROP, Warden-FPC-Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. JIMENEZ, Mr., Counselor, FPC-Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTIES, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHEAL CARVAJAL, Federal Bureau of Prisons Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLESTON C. IWUAGWU, Warden at FCI-Dublin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PERKS, Jail Commander at Estrella Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VILAYCHITH KHOUANMANY
Represented By: Vilaychith Khouanmany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?