Imran Imon v. Keeton, et al
Respondent / Appellee: JASON CILIBERTI, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, CHUCK KEETON, in his official capacity as Warden of the La Palma Correctional Center, CESAR TOPETE, in his official capacity as Assistnat Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, ALBERT R. CARTER, in his official capacity as Acting Phoenix Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security and ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services
Petitioner / Appellant: IMRAN HOSSAIN IMON
Case Number: 20-16596
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellant Imran Hossain Imon reply to response (). Date of service: 10/13/2020. [11855942] [20-16596] (Belous, Laura) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:50 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, William P. Barr, Albert R. Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete and Chad F. Wolf reply to response (). Date of service: 10/13/2020. [11855604] [20-16596] (Vick, Lindsay) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:12 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Imran Hossain Imon response opposing motion ([ # 6 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 6 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854487] [20-16596] (Belous, Laura) [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:56 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, William P. Barr, Albert R. Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete and Chad F. Wolf response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/09/2020. [11854312] [20-16596] (Vick, Lindsay) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:55 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KSL): Appellees have filed a motion to consolidate appeal No. 20-16596 with appeal No. 20-16825 (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ] in 20-16596). Appellants response to this motion is due October 9, 2020. Any reply is due by noon on October 13, 2020. Appellant has filed a motion to expedite the appeal in 20-16596 (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] ). Appellees response to this motion is due October 9, 2020. Any reply is due by noon on October 13, 2020. Pending adjudication of these motions, the previously established briefing schedule continues to apply. [11848090] (RT) [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:47 PM]
October 3, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant Imran Hossain Imon Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 10/03/2020. [11846447] [20-16596] (Belous, Laura) [Entered: 10/03/2020 12:01 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, William P. Barr, Albert R. Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete and Chad F. Wolf Motion to consolidate cases. Date of service: 10/02/2020. [11845857] [20-16596] (Vick, Lindsay) [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:06 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-16596: IFP] ). Receipt number: Per entry [ # 4 ]. [11843857] (TYL) [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:29 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/25/2020. (1) Petitioner's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 26 ) is granted and Petitioner may proceed on appeal without prepaying or giving security for fees and costs. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(2). (2) The Clerk of Court must send a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, indicating that it relates to Ninth Circuit Case Number 20-16596. (See document for further details). [11838460] (NAC) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:10 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Lindsay M. Vick for party(s) Appellee William P. Barr Appellee Chad F. Wolf Appellee Cesar Topete Appellee Alex M. Azar II Appellee Jason Ciliberti Appellee Chuck Keeton Appellee Albert R. Carter, in case 20-16596. [11796679] (NAC) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:55 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lindsay Marie Vick (U.S. Department of Justice, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees Alex M. Azar, II, William P. Barr, Albert R. Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 08/20/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11796640] [20-16596] (Vick, Lindsay) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:44 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Imran Hossain Imon opening brief due 10/22/2020. Appellees Alex M. Azar II, William P. Barr, Attorney General, Albert R. Carter, Jason Ciliberti, Chuck Keeton, Cesar Topete and Chad F. Wolf answering brief due 11/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11795230] (RT) [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Imran Imon v. Keeton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JASON CILIBERTI, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHUCK KEETON, in his official capacity as Warden of the La Palma Correctional Center
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CESAR TOPETE, in his official capacity as Assistnat Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ALBERT R. CARTER, in his official capacity as Acting Phoenix Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Lindsay M. Vick
Represented By: Khanrat Piensook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: IMRAN HOSSAIN IMON
Represented By: Laura Belous Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?