Bank of America, N.A. v. TRP Fund V, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Defendant: POSHBABY, LLC, AKA Poshbaby LLC Series 9070 Spring Mountain #114, LAKEVIEW OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, TRP FUND V, LLC and ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: ELIZABETH A. PETERSON
Case Number: 20-16626
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-16626. [11855761] (RR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:58 AM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 10/12/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11855104] [20-16626] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 10/12/2020 06:47 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-16626. [11854920] (RR) [Entered: 10/09/2020 05:05 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 10/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11854789] [20-16626] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:37 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/18/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11851535] (BLS) [Entered: 10/07/2020 05:07 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/07/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11813089] (BLS) [Entered: 09/03/2020 05:17 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11808654]. [20-16626] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:44 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808436] [20-16626] (Wright, John) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:17 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2020. Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC opening brief due 10/20/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 11/19/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11799800] (JBS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. TRP Fund V, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POSHBABY, LLC, AKA Poshbaby LLC Series 9070 Spring Mountain #114
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW OWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRP FUND V, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ELIZABETH A. PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?