Enrique Gomez Gutierrez, et al v. USA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ENRIQUE GOMEZ GUTIERREZ and SHANNON GOMEZ
Defendant / Appellee: JEANNE KENT, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, KERRI ANN QUIHUIS and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-16644
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellants Shannon Gomez and Enrique Gomez Gutierrez to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Shannon Gomez and Enrique Gomez Gutierrez opening brief due 11/23/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Jeanne Kent, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kerri Ann Quihuis and United States of America answering brief due 12/23/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11862202] (BG) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:12 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Enrique Gomez Gutierrez and Shannon Gomez. New requested due date is 11/23/2020. [11861362] [20-16644] (Gonzales, Xavier) [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:21 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11831069] (VS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:57 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): By September 25, 2020, counsel for each party intending to file a brief in this appeal is requested to provide a brief, confidential (not sent to opposing counsel) email to Robert S. Kaiser, Circuit Mediator, at robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov, explaining their clients views on how the mediator might be helpful. Counsel are requested to include the Ninth Circuit case number in the subject line. This communication will be kept confidential from the other parties in the case. This communication shall not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [11827826] (OC) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:50 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Courtney Elizabeth Moran for party(s) Appellee William P. Barr, Appellee Kerri Ann Quihuis, Appellee USA, Appellee Jeanne Kent and Appellee Kirstjen Nielsen, in case 20-16644. [11818573] (QDL) [Entered: 09/10/2020 09:17 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Courtney E. Moran (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees William P. Barr, Jeanne Kent, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kerri Ann Quihuis and USA. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11818302] [20-16644] (Moran, Courtney) [Entered: 09/09/2020 06:14 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/17/2020, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11815097] (VS) [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:30 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/01/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11810177]. [20-16644] (AD) [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:44 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Enrique Gomez Gutierrez and Shannon Gomez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2020. [11809891] [20-16644] (Gonzales, Xavier) [Entered: 09/01/2020 03:33 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Shannon Gomez and Enrique Gomez Gutierrez Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/01/2020. Appellants Shannon Gomez and Enrique Gomez Gutierrez opening brief due 10/23/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Jeanne Kent, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kerri Ann Quihuis and United States of America answering brief due 11/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11801916] (JBS) [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Enrique Gomez Gutierrez, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENRIQUE GOMEZ GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANNON GOMEZ
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNE KENT
Represented By: Gregory WIlliam Addington Esquire
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Gregory WIlliam Addington Esquire
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Gregory WIlliam Addington Esquire
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KERRI ANN QUIHUIS
Represented By: Gregory WIlliam Addington Esquire
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gregory WIlliam Addington Esquire
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?