Bank of America, N.A. v. Premier One Holdings, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Defendant: THL FAMILY INVESTMENT LLC, TICOR TITLE COMPANY, Trustee, WEI WEI CHEN and CACTUS CREEK AT MOUNTAIN'S EDGE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.
Counter Claimant: PREMIER ONE HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 20-16730
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/10/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Premier One Holdings, Inc. opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11860148] (BLS) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:14 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/14/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11827533] (BLS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:26 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11825428]. [20-16730] (AD) [Entered: 09/15/2020 06:44 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Premier One Holdings, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11824682] [20-16730] (Morris, Sarah) [Entered: 09/15/2020 12:59 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Premier One Holdings, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/15/2020. Appellant Premier One Holdings, Inc. opening brief due 11/03/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 12/03/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11815962] (JBS) [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Premier One Holdings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THL FAMILY INVESTMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TICOR TITLE COMPANY, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEI WEI CHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACTUS CREEK AT MOUNTAIN'S EDGE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: PREMIER ONE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Timothy Allen Wiseman
Represented By: Sarah A. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?