Pamela Valin, et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES VALIN and PAMELA VALIN
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC and U.S. BANK, N.A., as Trustee, Successor In Interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association, as Trustee for GSR Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-11, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-11
Case Number: 20-16746
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for 30 days. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin opening brief due 12/09/2020. Appellees Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 01/08/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11881913] (BG) [Entered: 11/04/2020 01:42 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin. New requested due date is 11/23/2020. [11881761] [20-16746] (Fox, Erik-Anthony) [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:20 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11843780] (MS) [Entered: 10/01/2020 11:45 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/01/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11830896] (VS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:51 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/16/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11826314]. [20-16746] (AD) [Entered: 09/16/2020 12:45 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11825995] [20-16746] (Fox, Erik-Anthony) [Entered: 09/16/2020 11:10 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/16/2020. Appellants James Valin and Pamela Valin opening brief due 11/09/2020. Appellees Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 12/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11817822] (JBS) [Entered: 09/09/2020 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pamela Valin, et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES VALIN
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W. Fox Esquire
Represented By: Jamie S. Cogburn Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAMELA VALIN
Represented By: Erik-Anthony W. Fox Esquire
Represented By: Jamie S. Cogburn Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., as Trustee, Successor In Interest to Wachovia Bank, National Association, as Trustee for GSR Mortgage Loan Trust 2004-11, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-11
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?