Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC and SOUTHERN HIGHLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 20-16893
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 12/08/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11889145] (BLS) [Entered: 11/10/2020 05:57 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/10/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11853553] (BLS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 08:39 AM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/07/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11850875]. [20-16893] (AD) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:44 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/07/2020. [11850444] [20-16893] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:30 AM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/07/2020. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 11/27/2020. Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11841861] (JBS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: Nicholas E. Belay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Nicholas E. Belay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN HIGHLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?