Miliam Borjas-Borjas v. William Barr, et al
Respondent / Appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, COREY PRICE, in his official capacity as Interim Phoenix Field Office Director for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the United States
Petitioner / Appellant: MILIAM MARGARITA BORJAS-BORJAS
Case Number: 20-16957
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas opening brief due 01/06/2021. [11901100] (JN) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:25 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas. New requested due date is 01/06/2021. [11900595] [20-16957] (Ayala, Siovhan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:38 AM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas to extend time to file the brief is not approved because you are requesting a date earlier than your current due date. The current briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas opening brief due 12/07/2020. [11900540] (JN) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:20 AM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas. New requested due date is 11/20/2020. [11900370] [20-16957] (Ayala, Siovhan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 07:29 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON and KENNETH K. LEE) The supplemented motion for a stay of removal (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 2 ] & [ # 3 ]) is denied. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418 (2009); Leiva-Perez v. Holder, 640 F.3d 962 (9th Cir. 2011). The opening brief remains due December 7, 2020. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing will be complete upon the filing of the opening brief. [11900156] (OC) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:48 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas Amended Motion to stay removal. Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11868999] [20-16957] (Ayala, Siovhan) [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:32 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas Motion to stay removal. Date of service: 10/08/2020. [11852625] [20-16957] (Ayala, Siovhan) [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:10 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Miliam Margarita Borjas-Borjas opening brief due 12/07/2020. [11851963] (JMR) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Miliam Borjas-Borjas v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: COREY PRICE, in his official capacity as Interim Phoenix Field Office Director for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MILIAM MARGARITA BORJAS-BORJAS
Represented By: Siovhan Sheridan Ayala Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?