Martin Ruiz v. Miguel Marquez, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MIGUEL MARQUEZ MARQUEZ, Guanajuato State Governor, MONSERRAT MARTINEZ SHOWS, Attorney, Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato State Government, ANGELICA RAMIREZ MORALEZ, Attorney, General Director of Labor, Subsecretary of Labor and Social Prevention, UNKNOWN PARTY, Director of the Health Department, Secretary of the State of Guanajuato, City of Leon, Guanajuato, Mexico, UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #3, JOSE CUAUHTEMOC CHAVEZ MUNOZ, Technique Secretary of Miguel Marquez Marquez, NORMA PATRICIA DURAN IBARRA, Attorney, President of the Special Joint Number Three of the Joint of Conciliation and Arbitration of Leon, UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #4, JUAN CARLOS MORENO ENASTROSA, Attorney, Representative of the Secretary of Public Education, RODRIGO SIERRA ORTIZ, General Director of Juridic Matters of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato Government, JUAN ANGEL RODRIGUEZ LOZANO, Teacher, Chief of the Department of Escolar Services of Basic Education, EUSEBIO VEGA PEREZ, Secretary of the Secretary of Education of the State of Guanajuato, GLORIA MAURA CABRERA MARTINEZ, Attorney, MARIA LIBIA GOMEZ PADILLA, Attorney, Subsecretary of Labor and Social Prevention, MARIA LUISA LEON TABARES, Teacher, Chief of the Unity of Services to the Education Support of Leon, ULISES ARTURO PLASCENCIA MUNOZ, Responsible of the Area of Escolar Control of the Unity of Services to the Education Support of Leon, UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #5, UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Does #2, MARIA ISABEL TINOCO TORREZ, Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato State Government, ROCIO IVETTE TREJO ROMO, Operative Staff of the Direction of Complaint- Denounces and Patrimonial Responsibility of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanjuato State Government, LUIS MIGUEL SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ, Director of Complaints- Denounces and Responsibility of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanjuato State Government and UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #1
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARTIN MORENO RUIZ
Case Number: 20-16962
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 7 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Martin Moreno Ruiz opening brief of 9 pages (Informal: No). Served on 11/23/2020. [11907906] (LA) [Entered: 11/27/2020 01:50 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11881266] (CKP) [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:14 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/20/2020. [11879380] (NAC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:30 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/28/2020. ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's "Request Pursuant to F.R. Civ. P. Rule 44 and F. R. App. P. Rule 10" (Doc. [29]) is denied as moot. (2) The Clerk of Court must forward of a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and must indicate that this Order relates to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' docket number 20-16962. [11874692] (QDL) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:34 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11861860] (CKP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:41 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/15/2020 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiffs Form to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in Appeal (Doc. 25) is denied as moot. (2) The Clerk of Court must forward of a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and must indicate that this Order relates to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals docket number 20-16962. [11861244] (RL) [Entered: 10/16/2020 09:23 AM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Martin Moreno Ruiz opening brief due 12/07/2020. [11852703] (JPD) [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Martin Ruiz v. Miguel Marquez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIGUEL MARQUEZ MARQUEZ, Guanajuato State Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONSERRAT MARTINEZ SHOWS, Attorney, Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato State Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELICA RAMIREZ MORALEZ, Attorney, General Director of Labor, Subsecretary of Labor and Social Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Director of the Health Department, Secretary of the State of Guanajuato, City of Leon, Guanajuato, Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE CUAUHTEMOC CHAVEZ MUNOZ, Technique Secretary of Miguel Marquez Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORMA PATRICIA DURAN IBARRA, Attorney, President of the Special Joint Number Three of the Joint of Conciliation and Arbitration of Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUAN CARLOS MORENO ENASTROSA, Attorney, Representative of the Secretary of Public Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RODRIGO SIERRA ORTIZ, General Director of Juridic Matters of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUAN ANGEL RODRIGUEZ LOZANO, Teacher, Chief of the Department of Escolar Services of Basic Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EUSEBIO VEGA PEREZ, Secretary of the Secretary of Education of the State of Guanajuato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLORIA MAURA CABRERA MARTINEZ, Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA LIBIA GOMEZ PADILLA, Attorney, Subsecretary of Labor and Social Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA LUISA LEON TABARES, Teacher, Chief of the Unity of Services to the Education Support of Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ULISES ARTURO PLASCENCIA MUNOZ, Responsible of the Area of Escolar Control of the Unity of Services to the Education Support of Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Does #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA ISABEL TINOCO TORREZ, Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanajuato State Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCIO IVETTE TREJO ROMO, Operative Staff of the Direction of Complaint- Denounces and Patrimonial Responsibility of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanjuato State Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS MIGUEL SANCHEZ HERNANDEZ, Director of Complaints- Denounces and Responsibility of the Secretary of Transparency and Render an Accounts of the Guanjuato State Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, Joe Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN MORENO RUIZ
Represented By: Martin Moreno Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?