AT&T Mobility, LLC, et al v. Charles Yeager, et al
Defendant: DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY, LLP, LAW OFFICES OF JOANNA R. MENDOZA, P.C., AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS, BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC., ED BOWLIN, CONNIE BOWLIN and LESSER LAW GROUP
Intervenor Plaintiff: PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: VICTORIA YEAGER
Cross Claimant: CHARLES E. YEAGER
Plaintiff / Appellee: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Case Number: 20-17253
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 Streamlined request [11] by Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager opening brief due 03/24/2021. Appellees AT&T Mobility, LLC, Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C., Lesser Law Group, Parsons Behle & Latimer and de la Pena & Holiday, LLP answering brief due 04/23/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12006835] (BG) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:16 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager. New requested due date is 03/24/2021. [12003940] [20-17253] (Williams, Jon) [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:06 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11935160] (CL) [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:49 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Cory Dayle Sinclair for party(s) Appellee Parsons Behle & Latimer. [11920578] (RL) [Entered: 12/09/2020 01:51 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Cory Dayle Sinclair (Parsons Behle & Latimer, 201 S. Main Street, Suite 1800, Salt Lake City, UT 84111) for Appellee Parsons Behle & Latimer. Date of service: 12/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11920262] [20-17253] (Sinclair, Cory) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:45 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/17/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 12/14/2020 ). [11918817] (CL) [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:55 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/14/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11916015] (CL) [Entered: 12/04/2020 07:32 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11905898]. [20-17253] (AD) [Entered: 11/24/2020 06:44 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/24/2020. [11905770] [20-17253] (Williams, Jon) [Entered: 11/24/2020 04:13 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Bryce Colter Jensen for party(s) Appellee Parsons Behle & Latimer. [11904724] (RL) [Entered: 11/24/2020 09:46 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bryce Colter Jensen (Parsons Behle & Latimer, 201 S. Main Street, Suite 1800, Salt Lake City, Utah 84111) for Appellee Parsons Behle & Latimer. Date of service: 11/24/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11904674] [20-17253] (Jensen, Bryce) [Entered: 11/24/2020 09:31 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/24/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/14/2020. Transcript due 01/11/2021. Appellants Charles E. Yeager and Victoria Yeager opening brief due 02/22/2021. Appellees AT&T Mobility, LLC, Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Law Offices of Joanna R. Mendoza, P.C., Lesser Law Group, Parsons Behle & Latimer and de la Pena & Holiday, LLP answering brief due 03/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11895754] (JBS) [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: AT&T Mobility, LLC, et al v. Charles Yeager, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Bryce Colter Jensen
Represented By: Cory Dayle Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: VICTORIA YEAGER
Represented By: Jon R. Williams Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CHARLES E. YEAGER
Represented By: Jon R. Williams Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Represented By: Laura Kohut Hoopis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DE LA PENA & HOLIDAY, LLP
Represented By: Gregory R. De La Pena
Represented By: Gregory Ramon De La Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW OFFICES OF JOANNA R. MENDOZA, P.C.
Represented By: Joanna R. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED BOWLIN
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE BOWLIN
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESSER LAW GROUP
Represented By: Don A. Lesser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?