Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. River Glider Avenue Trust, et al
Defendant: SAHARA SUNRISE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
3Rd Party Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG LLC
Appellant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Counter Claimant: RIVER GLIDER AVENUE TRUST
Case Number: 20-17271
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved in part. Streamlined requests only allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees River Glider Avenue Trust and Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11962281] (JN) [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:25 PM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. New requested due date is 02/19/2021. [11962254] [20-17271] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:59 AM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/09/2020, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11907704] (VS) [Entered: 11/27/2020 11:13 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11905185]. [20-17271] (AD) [Entered: 11/24/2020 12:44 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/24/2020. [11904498] [20-17271] (Haywood, Taylor) [Entered: 11/24/2020 08:01 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Taylor Haywood for party(s) Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, in case 20-17271. [11903695] (QDL) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:15 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Taylor T. Haywood (Akerman LLP, 1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1700, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Date of service: 11/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11903478] [20-17271] (Haywood, Taylor) [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:22 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/27/2020. Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees River Glider Avenue Trust and Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11899494] (JBS) [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. River Glider Avenue Trust, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAHARA SUNRISE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Edward Boyack Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Taylor Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: RIVER GLIDER AVENUE TRUST
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?