Mary Rogers v. IRS, et al
Defendant: PAUL J. ENJALRAN, IRS Officer, Area #6, DAVE ROUGHTON, President/CEO Safe Credit Union Deposits Service, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, GLORIA SULLIVAN, Director, Western Compliance Practice Area, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, K. KNIGHT, Sacramento County Clerk Recorder Deputy, KAMAL PREET KAUR, Sacramento South Land Park Branch Jit Case, THOMAS D. KRAMER, Program Manager, IRS, TIM MARRIOTT, President/CEO Schools Financial Credit Union Deposits Service, MIGUEL TORRES, Group Manager, IRS, DONNA ALLRED, Sacramento County Clerk Recorder, TIM BEHRENS, President, California Personnel Employees Retirement System Board of Administration, Lincoln Plaza North and MARCIE FROST, Chief Executive Officer, California Personnel Employees Retirement System Headquarters and Regional Offices
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARY A. NELSON ROGERS
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLES P. RETTING, IRS Commissioner and UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 20-17294
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11978084] (CKP) [Entered: 01/22/2021 01:11 PM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Ms. Mary A. Nelson Rogers. Date of service: 01/22/2021. [11978015] [20-17294] (Rogers, Mary) [Entered: 01/22/2021 12:38 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Bethany B. Hauser for party(s) Appellee Charles P. Retting, in case 20-17294. [11930696] (NAC) [Entered: 12/17/2020 06:59 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee IRS Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Amend the Caption]. Date of service: 12/17/2020. [11930689] [20-17294] (Hauser, Bethany) [Entered: 12/17/2020 06:35 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bethany B. Hauser (U.S. Department of Justice, P.O. Box 502, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees Charles P. Retting and IRS. Date of service: 12/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11930684] [20-17294] (Hauser, Bethany) [Entered: 12/17/2020 06:24 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Terminated Unregistered Attorney James Petrila for IRS and Charles P. Retting in 20-17294. IRS has alternate counsel, who should file notice of appearance for Retting as well if he is appearing in the case. [11918901] (SVG) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:31 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Bethany B. Hauser for party(s) Appellee IRS, in case 20-17294. [11918601] (NAC) [Entered: 12/08/2020 11:06 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bethany B. Hauser (U.S. Department of Justice, P.O. Box 502, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellee IRS. Date of service: 12/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11918591] [20-17294] (Hauser, Bethany) [Entered: 12/08/2020 11:04 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mary A. Nelson Rogers opening brief due 01/22/2021. Appellees Charles P. Retting and United States Internal Revenue Service answering brief due 02/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11904705] (RT) [Entered: 11/24/2020 09:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Rogers v. IRS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL J. ENJALRAN, IRS Officer, Area #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE ROUGHTON, President/CEO Safe Credit Union Deposits Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLORIA SULLIVAN, Director, Western Compliance Practice Area
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. KNIGHT, Sacramento County Clerk Recorder Deputy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMAL PREET KAUR, Sacramento South Land Park Branch Jit Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS D. KRAMER, Program Manager, IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM MARRIOTT, President/CEO Schools Financial Credit Union Deposits Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL TORRES, Group Manager, IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA ALLRED, Sacramento County Clerk Recorder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM BEHRENS, President, California Personnel Employees Retirement System Board of Administration, Lincoln Plaza North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIE FROST, Chief Executive Officer, California Personnel Employees Retirement System Headquarters and Regional Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY A. NELSON ROGERS
Represented By: Mary A. Nelson Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES P. RETTING, IRS Commissioner
Represented By: James Petrila
Represented By: Bethany B. Hauser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: James Petrila
Represented By: Bethany B. Hauser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?