In re: Pastuh, et al v. Yahoo! Inc., et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS HOWES, CRAIG WALQUIST, DATO MIO, CALEILA BURRELL, JOSE ABITBOL, WILLIAM TAYLOR, JIM FINNEGAN, ADAM SAVETT, SAMUEL HOLDEN FROSBURG, DANIELLE BECK, BEKIM MEHMETAJ, DEANA RIDOLFO, BRETT KANESHIRO, DANIEL MARGO, PUNAM PRAHALAD, SUSAN PARK, JAMES TULVE, PAUL DUGAS, ANNA NAUPA, LUCRESSE CAYEMITTE, REUVEN NATHANSON, TINA LEE, BARBARA STRAS, NANCY PERLMUTTER, HARMAN MOSELEY, MAHESH KHEMLANI, EDWIN MOLDAUER, ANN MARIE OSBORNE, MARIA SVENTEK, DAVID PAWLIK, RAYMOND COLLIER, DECONTEE KING-SACKIE, EDWARD MCMAHON, MICHAEL ORTEGA, AMIRAM TAPIRO, CHRISTOPHER HAVRON, SCARLETH ROBLES, YANIV RIVLIN, JEREMY FERRIS, JONATHAN LEVY, RAJESH GARG, KIM HOWARD, RONALD SCHWARTZ, MICHELLE GRECO, LOLITA MORRIS, KATELYN SMITH, DERRON APPLETON, JESSICA JAGIR, MARIA CORSO, ANDREW J. MORTENSEN, AMAR R. PATEL, MICHAEL STEPHEN, BRIAN NEFF, SAM ELSAYED ELDAKAK, JOSE ABITOL, HELEN CIANGIULLI, SAADYA KAUFMANN, ANDREA TOWNSEND, MALI GRANOT, GREGORY ACKERS, JENNIFER J. MYERS, TABITHA BAKER, DIANE NOBLES-ELDAKAK, FRANCISCO FILARES, LEAH CASSELL, POOJA GARG, YOSEF FELDMAN, HECTOR M. DE AVILA GONZALEZ, KIMBERLY HEINES, JAMAICA FLEWWELLIN, HASHMATULLAH ESSAR, GERALD CLEAVER, AMY VAIL, MADONNA COTE, HOVAHANNES AVETISYAN, RITESH GUJARATHI, MATTHEW RIDOLFO, JAMES HARTLINE, ASHISH GUPTA, SARAH RODDY and CHRISTOPHER GULLEY
Not Classified By Court: In re: YAHOO! INC. CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Defendant / Appellee: AABACO SMALL BUSINESS, LLC and YAHOO! INC.
Appellant: PASTUH
Case Number: 20-17438
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Pastuh motion Request for Mediation based on voluntary choice. Deficiencies: None. [11991092] (JFF) [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:50 AM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Pastuh Request for adding the Loves to Mediators. Deficiencies: None. [11982137] (JFF) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:10 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Pastuh Request for Preliminary Locating in Underground Space. Deficiencies: None. [11974602] (JFF) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:32 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Pastuh I am requesting for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Deficiencies: None. [11969892] (JFF) [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:23 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Pastuh motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11969884] (JFF) [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:19 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees Jose Abitbol, Jose Abitol, Gregory Ackers, Derron Appleton, Hovahannes Avetisyan, Tabitha Baker, Danielle Beck, Caleila Burrell, Leah Cassell, Lucresse Cayemitte, Helen Ciangiulli, Gerald Cleaver, Raymond Collier, Maria Corso, Madonna Cote, Hector M. De Avila Gonzalez, Paul Dugas, Sam Elsayed Eldakak, Hashmatullah Essar, Yosef Feldman, Jeremy Ferris, Francisco Filares, Jim Finnegan, Jamaica Flewwellin, Samuel Holden Frosburg, Pooja Garg, Rajesh Garg, Mali Granot, Michelle Greco, Ritesh Gujarathi, Christopher Gulley, Ashish Gupta, James Hartline, Christopher Havron, Kimberly Heines, Kim Howard, Thomas Howes, Jessica Jagir, Brett Kaneshiro, Saadya Kaufmann, Mahesh Khemlani, Decontee King-Sackie, Tina Lee, Jonathan Levy, Daniel Margo, Edward McMahon, Bekim Mehmetaj, Dato Mio, Edwin Moldauer, Lolita Morris, Andrew J. Mortensen, Harman Moseley, Jennifer J. Myers, Reuven Nathanson, Anna Naupa, Brian Neff, Diane Nobles-Eldakak, Michael Ortega, Ann Marie Osborne, Susan Park, Amar R. Patel, David Pawlik, Nancy Perlmutter, Punam Prahalad, Deana Ridolfo, Matthew Ridolfo, Yaniv Rivlin, Scarleth Robles, Sarah Roddy, Adam Savett, Ronald Schwartz, Katelyn Smith, Michael Stephen, Barbara Stras, Maria Sventek, Amiram Tapiro, William Taylor, Andrea Townsend, James Tulve, Amy Vail and Craig Walquist Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 01/11/2021. [11958566] [20-17438] (Love, Andrew) [Entered: 01/11/2021 10:31 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Andrew Love for party(s) Appellee Saadya Kaufmann Appellee Ann Marie Osborne Appellee Christopher Gulley Appellee Ritesh Gujarathi Appellee Mali Granot Appellee Tina Lee Appellee Francisco Filares Appellee Deana Ridolfo Appellee Yaniv Rivlin Appellee Hovahannes Avetisyan Appellee Leah Cassell Appellee Sarah Roddy Appellee Maria Sventek Appellee Rajesh Garg Appellee Tabitha Baker Appellee Barbara Stras Appellee Jose Abitol Appellee Jamaica Flewwellin Appellee Andrea Townsend Appellee Mahesh Khemlani Appellee Anna Naupa Appellee Edward McMahon Appellee James Tulve Appellee Jonathan Levy Appellee Decontee King-Sackie Appellee Punam Prahalad Appellee Paul Dugas Appellee Hashmatullah Essar Appellee James Hartline Appellee Bekim Mehmetaj Appellee Helen Ciangiulli Appellee Raymond Collier Appellee Gregory Ackers Appellee Michael Stephen Appellee Lolita Morris Appellee Derron Appleton Appellee Sam Elsayed Eldakak Appellee Pooja Garg Appellee Yosef Feldman Appellee Kimberly Heines Appellee William Taylor Appellee Gerald Cleaver Appellee Diane Nobles-Eldakak Appellee Amy Vail Appellee Madonna Cote Appellee Nancy Perlmutter Appellee Ronald Schwartz Appellee Andrew J. Mortensen Appellee Susan Park Appellee Lucresse Cayemitte Appellee Thomas Howes Appellee Samuel Holden Frosburg Appellee Jose Abitbol Appellee Kim Howard Appellee Craig Walquist Appellee Maria Corso Appellee Brett Kaneshiro Appellee Ashish Gupta Appellee Katelyn Smith Appellee Daniel Margo Appellee Reuven Nathanson Appellee Hector M. De Avila Gonzalez Appellee Matthew Ridolfo Appellee Brian Neff Appellee Amar R. Patel Appellee Christopher Havron Appellee Edwin Moldauer Appellee David Pawlik Appellee Scarleth Robles Appellee Jennifer J. Myers Appellee Caleila Burrell Appellee Jim Finnegan Appellee Adam Savett Appellee Dato Mio Appellee Harman Moseley Appellee Amiram Tapiro Appellee Jessica Jagir Appellee Danielle Beck Appellee Jeremy Ferris Appellee Michelle Greco Appellee Michael Ortega, in case 20-17438. [11956260] (JFF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:25 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew S. Love (Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800, San Francisco, CA, 94104) for Appellees Jose Abitbol, Gregory Ackers, Derron Appleton, Jose Abitol, Hovahannes Avetisyan, Tabitha Baker, Danielle Beck, Caleila Burrell, Leah Cassell, Lucresse Cayemitte, Helen Ciangiulli, Gerald Cleaver, Raymond Collier, Maria Corso, Madonna Cote, Hector M. De Avila Gonzalez, Paul Dugas, Sam Elsayed Eldakak, Hashmatullah Essar, Yosef Feldman, Jeremy Ferris, Francisco Filares, Jim Finnegan, Jamaica Flewwellin, Samuel Holden Frosburg, Pooja Garg, Rajesh Garg, Mali Granot, Michelle Greco, Ritesh Gujarathi, Christopher Gulley, Ashish Gupta, James Hartline, Christopher Havron, Kimberly Heines, Kim Howard, Thomas Howes, Jessica Jagir, Brett Kaneshiro, Saadya Kaufmann, Mahesh Khemlani, Decontee King-Sackie, Tina Lee, Jonathan Levy, Daniel Margo, Edward McMahon, Bekim Mehmetaj, Dato Mio, Edwin Moldauer, Lolita Morris, Andrew J. Mortensen, Harman Moseley, Jennifer J. Myers, Reuven Nathanson, Anna Naupa, Brian Neff, Diane Nobles-Eldakak, Michael Ortega, Ann Marie Osborne, Susan Park, Amar R. Patel, David Pawlik, Nancy Perlmutter, Punam Prahalad, Deana Ridolfo, Matthew Ridolfo, Yaniv Rivlin, Scarleth Robles, Sarah Roddy, Adam Savett, Ronald Schwartz, Katelyn Smith, Michael Stephen, Barbara Stras, Maria Sventek, Amiram Tapiro, William Taylor, Andrea Townsend, James Tulve, Amy Vail and Craig Walquist. Date of service: 01/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11956209] [20-17438] (Love, Andrew) [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:09 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 01/19/2021. Transcript due 02/17/2021. Appellant Pastuh opening brief due 03/26/2021. Appellees Aabaco Small Business, LLC and Yahoo! Inc. answering brief due 04/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11931443] (RT) [Entered: 12/17/2020 12:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Pastuh, et al v. Yahoo! Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HOWES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG WALQUIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DATO MIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEILA BURRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ABITBOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM FINNEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL HOLDEN FROSBURG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEKIM MEHMETAJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANA RIDOLFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT KANESHIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MARGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUNAM PRAHALAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES TULVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL DUGAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA NAUPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCRESSE CAYEMITTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REUVEN NATHANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA STRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY PERLMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARMAN MOSELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHESH KHEMLANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN MOLDAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN MARIE OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA SVENTEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PAWLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND COLLIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DECONTEE KING-SACKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ORTEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIRAM TAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HAVRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCARLETH ROBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANIV RIVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY FERRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJESH GARG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GRECO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOLITA MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATELYN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRON APPLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA JAGIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA CORSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW J. MORTENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAR R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STEPHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN NEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM ELSAYED ELDAKAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ABITOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN CIANGIULLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAADYA KAUFMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALI GRANOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY ACKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER J. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABITHA BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE NOBLES-ELDAKAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO FILARES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH CASSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POOJA GARG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOSEF FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR M. DE AVILA GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY HEINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAICA FLEWWELLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASHMATULLAH ESSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD CLEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY VAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADONNA COTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOVAHANNES AVETISYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITESH GUJARATHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW RIDOLFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HARTLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHISH GUPTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH RODDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER GULLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: YAHOO! INC. CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AABACO SMALL BUSINESS, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Alberto Danon
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim Esquire
Represented By: Joshua A. Jessen Esquire
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Represented By: Michael Li-Ming Wong
Represented By: John Joseph Delionado Jr.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YAHOO! INC.
Represented By: Samuel Alberto Danon
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim Esquire
Represented By: Joshua A. Jessen Esquire
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Represented By: Michael Li-Ming Wong
Represented By: John Joseph Delionado Jr.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PASTUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?