U.S. Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Appellant: U.S. BANK, N.A., As Trustee for the Holders of the Wmalt 2006-AR8 Trust
Defendant / Appellee: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC and ANTELOPE CANYON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Cross Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC and BANK OF AMERICA, NA
Counter Claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Case Number: 20-17449
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 Streamlined request [14] by Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. to extend time to file the brief is not approved because briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12001769] (JN) [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:55 AM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.. New requested due date is 03/18/2021. [12001506] [20-17449] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 02/11/2021 05:52 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 Attorney Holly Walker in 20-17449 substituted by Attorney Donna M. Wittig in 20-17449 [11987614] (NAC) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:55 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donna M. Wittig (Akerman LLP 1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200, Las Vegas, NV 89134) for Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Substitution for Attorney Holly Walker for Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 02/01/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11987554] [20-17449] (Wittig, Donna) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:33 AM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/03/2021, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11986192]--[Edited 01/29/2021 by MS] (CL) [Entered: 01/29/2021 01:01 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. response to order to show cause dated 01/07/2021. Date of service: 01/14/2021. [11963243] [20-17449] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 01/14/2021 08:30 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal may not be final or appealable. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with Rule 54(b)); see also Frank Briscoe Co., Inc. v. Morrison-Knudsen Co., Inc., 776 F.2d 1414, 1416 (9th Cir. 1985) (order disposing of fewer than all claims or parties is not appealable absent express determination from district court that there is no just reason for delay under Rule 54(b)). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11955641] (OC) [Entered: 01/07/2021 11:41 AM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/25/2021, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11953946] (MS) [Entered: 01/06/2021 09:39 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/28/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11946079]. [20-17449] (AD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:44 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellant U.S. Bank, N.A., Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Appellant Bank of America, NA, in case 20-17449. [11945583] (QDL) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:16 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/28/2020. [11945579] [20-17449] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:13 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave N, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11945387] [20-17449] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 12/28/2020 06:36 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellant U.S. Bank, N.A. Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC Appellant Bank of America, NA, in case 20-17449. [11937357] (JFF) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:42 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave N, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/22/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11936719] [20-17449] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:44 AM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/28/2020. Appellants Bank of America, NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. opening brief due 02/16/2021. Appellees Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC answering brief due 03/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11934481] (JBS) [Entered: 12/21/2020 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: U.S. BANK, N.A., As Trustee for the Holders of the Wmalt 2006-AR8 Trust
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Holly Walker
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTELOPE CANYON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Holly Walker
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NA
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Holly Walker
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?