350 Montana, et al v. David Bernhardt, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JOSEPH BALASH, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary of Land and Minerals Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior, DAVID BERNHARDT, Secretary of the Department of the Interior, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, an agency within the U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING, an agency within the U.S. Department of the Interior, MARCELO CALLE, in his official capacity as Program Support Division Manager of U.S. Office of Surface Mining Western Region, MARGARET EVERSON, in her official capacity as Principal Deputy Director Exercising Authority of the Director of U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, GLENDA OWENS, in her official capacity as Director of U.S. Office of Surface Mining, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and DAVID BERRY, in his official capacity as Regional Director of U.S. Office of Surface Mining Western Region
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: SIGNAL PEAK ENERGY, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: SIERRA CLUB, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER and 350 MONTANA
Case Number: 20-35411
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL): Appellants motion to dismiss Appeal No. 20-35410 (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court as to Appeal No. 20-35410 only. The briefing schedule in Appeal No. 20-35411 shall proceed as follows: appellants' opening brief is due August 19, 2020; appellees' answering brief is due September 21, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11733954] (AF) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:15 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, USDOI and USFWS Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/24/2020. [11732058] [20-35410] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 20-35411. 6/24/2020 by TYL] (Toth, Brian) [Entered: 06/24/2020 11:17 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 07/13/2020, 10:00 a.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [11732422] [20-35410, 20-35411] (VS) [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:58 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED -Dial-in AssessmentConference, 06/24/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/22/2020 ). [11711522] [20-35410, 20-35411] (VS) [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:35 PM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/22/2020, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11709560] [20-35410, 20-35411] (VS) [Entered: 06/03/2020 11:03 AM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, USDOI and USFWS in 20-35410, Appellees Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, USDOI and USFWS in 20-35411 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/20/2020. [11697082] [20-35410, 20-35411] (Toth, Brian) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:57 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11696823]. [20-35411] (AD) [Entered: 05/20/2020 12:44 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and WildEarth Guardians in 20-35410, Appellants 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and WildEarth Guardians in 20-35411 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/20/2020. [11696393] [20-35410, 20-35411] (Hernandez, Shiloh) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:06 AM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Brian C. Toth for party(s) Appellee U.S. Office of Surface Mining Appellee USFWS Appellee Margaret Everson Appellee USDOI Appellee Marcelo Calle Appellee Glenda Owens Appellee David Bernhardt Appellee David Berry, in case 20-35411 Attorney(s) Brian C. Toth for party(s) Appellant Marcelo Calle Appellant USDOI Appellant David Berry Appellant USFWS Appellant U.S. Office of Surface Mining Appellant David Bernhardt Appellant Margaret Everson Appellant Glenda Owens Appellant Joseph Balash, in case 20-35410. [11695707] [20-35410, 20-35411] (CW) [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:58 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian C. Toth (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 7415, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellants Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, USDOI and USFWS in 20-35410, Appellees Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, USDOI and USFWS in 20-35411. Date of service: 05/19/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11695532] [20-35410, 20-35411] (Toth, Brian) [Entered: 05/19/2020 12:49 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and WildEarth Guardians Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/20/2020. First cross appeal brief due 08/19/2020 for 350 Montana, Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Montana Environmental Information Center, Glenda Owens, Sierra Club, Signal Peak Energy, LLC, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Office of Surface Mining and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Second brief on cross appeal due for 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and WildEarth Guardians. Third brief on cross appeal due 10/21/2020 for Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, Signal Peak Energy, LLC, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Office of Surface Mining and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and WildEarth Guardians is due within 21 days from service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11689578] [20-35411, 20-35410] (RT) [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: 350 Montana, et al v. David Bernhardt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH BALASH, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary of Land and Minerals Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BERNHARDT, Secretary of the Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, an agency within the U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING, an agency within the U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCELO CALLE, in his official capacity as Program Support Division Manager of U.S. Office of Surface Mining Western Region
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGARET EVERSON, in her official capacity as Principal Deputy Director Exercising Authority of the Director of U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENDA OWENS, in her official capacity as Director of U.S. Office of Surface Mining
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BERRY, in his official capacity as Regional Director of U.S. Office of Surface Mining Western Region
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: SIGNAL PEAK ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: Hadassah Marie Reimer
Represented By: Sarah C. Bordelon
Represented By: John C. Martin Esquire
Represented By: Victoria A. Marquis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: 350 MONTANA
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?