Lindsay Hecox, et al v. Bradley Little, et al
Defendant / Appellant: INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF BOISE CITY, # 1; in thier official capacities, COBY DENNIS, in his official capapcity as superintendent of the Independent School District of Boise City #1, MARLENE TROMP, in her official capacity as President of Boise State University, BRADLEY LITTLE, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Idaho, SHERRI YBARRA, in her official capapcity as the Superintendent of Public Instruction of the State of Idaho and as a member of the Idaho State Board of Education, INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF BOISE CITY, # 1, BOISE STATE UNIVERSITY, INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE IDAHO CODE COMMISSION, in their official capacities and INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION, in their official capacities
Intervenor: MARY MARSHALL and MADISON KENYON
Plaintiff / Appellee: JANE DOE, with her next friends Jean Doe and John Doe and LINDSAY HECOX
Case Number: 20-35813
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 34 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 33 ] submitted by Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11891594] [20-35813, 20-35815] (KWG) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:23 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11891449] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Brooks, Roger) [Entered: 11/12/2020 08:45 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 32 Terminated Jeffrey Shafer for Mary Marshall and Madison Kenyon in 20-35815 [11891422] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 06:25 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Jeffrey Shafer for Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11891412] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Brooks, Roger) [Entered: 11/12/2020 06:11 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 30 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 28 ] submitted by Boise State University, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 29 ] submitted by Boise State University, et al. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11891000] [20-35813, 20-35815] (KWG) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:36 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Boise State University, Independent School District of Boise City, Individual Members of the Board of Trustees of the Independent School District of Boise City, Individual Members of the Idaho Code Commission, Individual Members of the State Board of Education, Coby Dennis, Bradley Little, Marlene Tromp and Sherri Ybarra in 20-35813. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11890951] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Zanzig, W.) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:24 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 28 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Bradley Little, Sherri Ybarra, Individual Members of the State Board of Education, Boise State University, Marlene Tromp, Independent School District of Boise City, Coby Dennis, Individual Members of the Board of Trustees of the Independent School District of Boise City and Individual Members of the Idaho Code Commission in 20-35813. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11890944] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Zanzig, W.) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:20 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 Terminated Z Gabriel Arkles for Lindsay Hecox in 20-35813 and Jane Doe in 20-35815 [11889648] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:32 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mr. Z Gabriel Arkles for Appellee Lindsay Hecox in 20-35813, Attorney Mr. Z Gabriel Arkles for Appellee Jane Doe in 20-35815. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11889626] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Arkles, Z Gabriel) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:25 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 25 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11889600] [20-35813, 20-35815] (MS) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:18 AM]
November 8, 2020 Filing 24 Added Attorney(s) Catherine West for party(s) Appellee Jane Doe Appellee Lindsay Hecox, in case 20-35815 Attorney(s) Catherine West for party(s) Appellee Jane Doe Appellee Lindsay Hecox, in case 20-35813. [11885567] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 11/08/2020 05:27 PM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Catherine Ann West (Legal Voice, 907 Pine St., Ste. 500, Seattle WA 98101) for Appellees Lindsay Hecox and Jane Doe in 20-35813, 20-35815. Date of service: 11/07/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11885516] [20-35813, 20-35815] (West, Catherine) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:14 AM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 Added Attorney(s) Kristen K. Waggoner for party(s) Appellant-Intervenor Mary Marshall Appellant-Intervenor Madison Kenyon, in case 20-35815. [11861246] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 10/16/2020 09:23 AM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristen K. Waggoner (Alliance Defending Freedom, 440 First Street NW, Suite 600, Washington, D.C. 20001) for Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Date of service: 10/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11861233] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Waggoner, Kristen) [Entered: 10/16/2020 09:17 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 Added Attorney(s) Christiana M. Holcomb for party(s) Appellant-Intervenor Mary Marshall Appellant-Intervenor Madison Kenyon, in case 20-35815. [11860469] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 03:18 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christiana M. Holcomb (Alliance Defending Freedom, 440 First Street NW, Suite 600, Washington, D.C., 20001) for Appellants-Intervenors Mary Marshall and Madison Kenyon in 20-35815. Date of service: 10/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11860208] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Holcomb, Christiana) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:39 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Added Attorney(s) Z Gabriel Arkles for party(s) Appellee Jane Doe, in case 20-35815 Attorney(s) Z Gabriel Arkles for party(s) Appellee Lindsay Hecox, in case 20-35813. [11859363] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 07:41 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Z Gabriel Arkles (ACLU, 125 Broad St. 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004) for Appellee Lindsay Hecox in 20-35813, Appellee Jane Doe in 20-35815. Date of service: 10/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11859353] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Arkles, Z Gabriel) [Entered: 10/15/2020 07:14 AM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 Added Attorney(s) Dayton P. Reed for party(s) Appellant Coby Dennis, Appellant Independent School District of Boise City, Appellant Individual Members of the Idaho Code Commission, Appellant Boise State University, Appellant Bradley Little, Appellant Individual Members of the State Board of Education, Appellant Marlene Tromp, Appellant Individual Members of the Board of Trustees of the Independent School District of Boise City and Appellant Sherri Ybarra, in case 20-35813. [11844385] [20-35813, 20-35815] (QDL) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:24 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dayton P. Reed (Idaho Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division, P.O. 83720, Boise, ID 83720-0010) for Appellants Bradley Little, Sherri Ybarra, Individual Members of the State Board of Education, Boise State University, Marlene Tromp, Independent School District of Boise City, Coby Dennis, Individual Members of the Board of Trustees of the Independent School District of Boise City and Individual Members of the Idaho Code Commission in 20-35813. Date of service: 10/01/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11844352] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Reed, Dayton) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:13 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Christopher Paul Schandevel for party(s) Appellant-Intervenor Mary Marshall and Appellant-Intervenor Madison Kenyon, in case 20-35815. [11842503] [20-35813, 20-35815] (QDL) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:32 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher P. Schandevel (Alliance Defending Freedom, 20116 Ashbrook Place, Suite 250, Ashburn, VA 20147) for Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Date of service: 09/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11842494] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Schandevel, Christopher) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:29 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The existing briefing schedule is VACATED. The following briefing schedule shall govern this preliminary injunction appeal: The opening briefs and excerpts of record are due not later than November 12, 2020. The consolidated answering brief is due December 10, 2020 or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier. The optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. [11840960] [20-35813, 20-35815] (SB) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:44 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court will be reset by separate order. See order for instructions and details. [11840882] [20-35813, 20-35815] (LW) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:15 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) John J. Bursch for party(s) Appellant-Intervenor Mary Marshall Appellant-Intervenor Madison Kenyon, in case 20-35815. [11834098] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:03 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John J. Bursch (Alliance Defending Freedom, 440 First Street NW, Suite 600, Washington, DC 20001) for Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Date of service: 09/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11834051] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Bursch, John) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:42 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/21/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11830878]. [20-35813] (AD) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:44 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/21/2020. [11830867] [20-35815, 20-35813] (Brooks, Roger) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:41 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Roger Greenwood Brooks for party(s) Appellant-Intervenor Mary Marshall Appellant-Intervenor Madison Kenyon, in case 20-35815. [11830579] [20-35813, 20-35815] (CW) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:07 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Roger G. Brooks (Alliance Defending Freedom) for Appellants-Intervenors Madison Kenyon and Mary Marshall in 20-35815. Date of service: 09/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11830461] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Brooks, Roger) [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:31 AM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/18/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11829996]. [20-35813] (AD) [Entered: 09/18/2020 06:44 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Boise State University, Coby Dennis, Independent School District of Boise City, Individual Members of the Board of Trustees of the Independent School District of Boise City, Individual Members of the Idaho Code Commission, Individual Members of the State Board of Education, Bradley Little, Marlene Tromp and Sherri Ybarra in 20-35813 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/18/2020. [11829481] [20-35813, 20-35815] (Zanzig, W.) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:28 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 20-35813 and 20-35815. These consolidated appeals filed on September 16, 2020 are preliminary injunction appeals. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaires are due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The opening briefs and excerpts of record are due not later than October 14, 2020. The consolidated answering brief is due November 12, 2020 or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier. The optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to timely file an opening brief may result in automatic dismissal of by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11827928] [20-35813, 20-35815] (AF) [Entered: 09/17/2020 02:24 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows:. to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11827316] (RT) [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lindsay Hecox, et al v. Bradley Little, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF BOISE CITY, # 1; in thier official capacities
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COBY DENNIS, in his official capapcity as superintendent of the Independent School District of Boise City #1
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARLENE TROMP, in her official capacity as President of Boise State University
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRADLEY LITTLE, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Idaho
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHERRI YBARRA, in her official capapcity as the Superintendent of Public Instruction of the State of Idaho and as a member of the Idaho State Board of Education
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF BOISE CITY, # 1
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BOISE STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE IDAHO CODE COMMISSION, in their official capacities
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION, in their official capacities
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Steven L. Olsen
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MARY MARSHALL
Represented By: Bruce D. Skaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MADISON KENYON
Represented By: Bruce D. Skaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE DOE, with her next friends Jean Doe and John Doe
Represented By: Kathleen R. Hartnett
Represented By: James D. Esseks
Represented By: Elizabeth Prelogar
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Andrew Barr
Represented By: Catherine West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDSAY HECOX
Represented By: Kathleen R. Hartnett
Represented By: James D. Esseks
Represented By: Elizabeth Prelogar
Represented By: Richard Alan Eppink
Represented By: Andrew Barr
Represented By: Catherine West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?