Willie Johnson v. Colette Peters, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JONATHAN LO, COLETTE S. PETERS, JERRY MORDHORST, BRAD CAIN, CHARLES PALMER, ANTHONY JOHNSON and SUNQUEST, Lt.
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE LEE JOHNSON
Case Number: 20-35855
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Brad Cain, Anthony Johnson, Jonathan Lo, Jerry Mordhorst, Charles Palmer, Colette S. Peters and Sunquest response to motion ([ # 5 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 11/17/2020. [11895743] [20-35855] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 11/17/2020 11:42 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11892528] (CKP) [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:10 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/13/2020. [Case Number 20-35855: Partially Paid] [11892243] (RL) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:14 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Willie Lee Johnson FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/29/2020. [11892239] (RL) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:13 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Willie Lee Johnson FORM 27 motion for preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/29/2020. [11892232] (RL) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:12 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Attorneys Nathan Riemersma substituted by Attorneys Denise Gale Fjordbeck, [11856505] (JFF) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:18 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Brad Cain, Anthony Johnson, Jonathan Lo, Jerry Mordhorst, Charles Palmer, Colette S. Peters and Sunquest. Substitution for Attorney Nathan Riemersma for Appellees Brad Cain, Anthony Johnson, Jonathan Lo, Jerry Mordhorst, Charles Palmer, Colette S. Peters and Sunquest. Date of service: 10/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11856376] [20-35855] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:37 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11846986] (CKP) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:08 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Willie Lee Johnson opening brief due 11/30/2020. Appellees Brad Cain, Anthony Johnson, Jonathan Lo, Jerry Mordhorst, Charles Palmer, Colette S. Peters and Sunquest answering brief due 12/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11845033] (JPD) [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie Johnson v. Colette Peters, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN LO
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLETTE S. PETERS
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY MORDHORST
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD CAIN
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES PALMER
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY JOHNSON
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNQUEST, Lt.
Represented By: Nathan Riemersma
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE LEE JOHNSON
Represented By: Willie Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?