Jonathan Rodriguez v. Brad Cain, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JONATHAN JASON RODRIGUEZ
Defendant / Appellee: T. JOST, N. MAIN, F. SERRANO, BANNER, C. ANDERSON, BRAD CAIN, G. KAUTZ and J. BELL
Case Number: 20-36006
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellee Brad Cain response to motion ([ # 9 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 01/08/2021. [11956691] [20-36006] (Shah, Peenesh) [Entered: 01/08/2021 09:58 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck substituted by Attorney Peenesh Shah [11956273] (DJV) [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:29 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peenesh H. Shah (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees C. Anderson, Banner, J. Bell, Brad Cain, T. Jost, G. Kautz, N. Main and F. Serrano. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Denise Gale Fjordbeck for Appellee Brad Cain. Date of service: 01/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11955930] [20-36006] (Shah, Peenesh) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:08 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 Filed original and 5 copies of Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/22/2020. [11954760] (KWG) [Entered: 01/06/2021 03:45 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): Appellants motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief received on December 30, 2020. The answering brief is due January 29, 2021; and the reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11954524] (AF) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:08 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11951224] (CKP) [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:52 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez motion for reverse dismissal and grant preliminary injunction and T.R.O. Deficiencies: None. [11950966] (JFF) [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:09 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 Received original and 5 copies of Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/22/2020. Major deficiency: motion to extend time to file brief is pending. [11949525] (LA) [Entered: 12/31/2020 09:53 AM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez letter dated re: case information. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11949200] (JFF) [Entered: 12/30/2020 04:30 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 12/05/2020. [Case Number 20-36006: Partially Paid] [11949196] (JFF) [Entered: 12/30/2020 04:28 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief , for injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on. [11936652] (JFF) [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:07 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Michael R. Washington in 20-36006 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 20-36006 [11906865] (CW) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:39 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellee Brad Cain. Substitution for Attorney Michael R. Washington for Appellee Brad Cain. Date of service: 11/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11906632] [20-36006] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:41 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The appeal filed November 17, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The briefing schedule shall be established as follows: appellants opening brief is due December 21, 2020; appellees answering brief is due January 19, 2021; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed shall be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellant's forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellant's account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall serve a prisoner authorization form on appellant along with this order. [11905451] (CKP) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:18 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jonathan Jason Rodriguez opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellee Brad Cain answering brief due 02/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11898317] (JPD) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jonathan Rodriguez v. Brad Cain, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN JASON RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jonathan Jason Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. JOST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: N. MAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. SERRANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD CAIN
Represented By: Michael R. Washington
Represented By: Peenesh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. KAUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?