CTA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CALIFORNIA TRUCKING ASSOCIATION, THOMAS ODOM and RAVINDER SINGH
Defendant / Appellant: PATRICK W. HENNING, in his official capacity as the Director of the Employment Development Department, ANDRE SCHOORL, in his official capacity as the Acting Director of the Department of Industrial Relations of the State of California, LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as Labor Commissioner of the State of California, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement, JULIE SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency, XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California and JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
Amicus Curiae: LOS ANGELES CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, CITY OF OAKLAND, CALIFORNIA LABOR FEDERATION, AFL-CIO and CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 20-55106
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Appellees California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh in 20-55106, 20-55107 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/06/2020. Date of service: 03/23/2020. [11639006] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:06 PM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 33 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 30 ] submitted by Los Angeles City Attorney's Office and City of Oakland is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636454] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:46 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 27 ] submitted by California Labor Federation, AFL-CIO is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636445] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:43 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 31 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae California Labor Federation, AFL-CIO in 20-55106 and 20-55107. [11636429] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:40 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 30 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Los Angeles City Attorney and the City of Oakland. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634687] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Goldstein, Danielle) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:04 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 29 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending CELA in 20-55106 and 20-55107. [11634465] [20-55106, 20-55107] (HH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:37 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) California Employment Lawyers Association Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 03/31/2020. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634424] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:18 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 27 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Labor Federation. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634243] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Rosenfeld, David) [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:18 PM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) California Employment Lawyers Association Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 03/25/2020. Date of service: 03/17/2020. [11632073] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:45 AM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 23 ] submitted by State Appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11627530] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:18 AM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 21 ] and joint excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by IBT are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11627389] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:37 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 23 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick W. Henning, Andre Schoorl and Julie A. Su in 20-55106. Date of service: 03/11/2020. [11626945] [20-55106, 20-55107]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF. 03/12/2020 by LA] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:50 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants IBT in 20-55107 and Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick W. Henning, Andre Schoorl and Julie A. Su in 20-55106. Date of service: 03/11/2020. [11626876] [20-55106, 20-55107]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect all party filers. 03/12/2020 by LA] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 03/11/2020 05:35 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant IBT in 20-55107. Date of service: 03/11/2020. [11626875] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 03/11/2020 05:30 PM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant IBT in 20-55107 reply to response (). Date of service: 03/02/2020. [11615670] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 03/02/2020 05:41 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellees California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh in 20-55106, 20-55107 response opposing motion ([ # 14 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 14 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/24/2020. [11607182] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:51 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Los Angeles City Attorney's Office and City of Oakland. [11605076] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:51 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh in 20-55106, 20-55107 response to motion ([ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11604058] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 02/20/2020 06:12 PM]
February 19, 2020 Filing 16 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney and the City of Oakland. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602511] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Goldstein, Danielle) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:36 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 13 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant IBT; The opening briefs and excerpts of record are due not later than 03/11/2020; the consolidated answering brief is due 04/10/2020, or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [11600167] [20-55106, 20-55107] (GS) [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:49 PM]
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellant IBT in 20-55107 Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 02/12/2020. [11595138] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:58 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant IBT in 20-55107 Joint Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/11/2020. Date of service: 02/11/2020. [11594122] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Kushner, Andrew) [Entered: 02/11/2020 05:25 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11587298] [20-55106, 20-55107] (VS) [Entered: 02/06/2020 08:20 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee by Xavier Becerra, et al. appellants in case no. 20-55106. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 02/04/2020. [11585902] [20-55106, 20-55107] (RT) [Entered: 02/05/2020 09:12 AM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11583687]. [20-55106] (AD) [Entered: 02/03/2020 06:44 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11583684]. [20-55106] (AD) [Entered: 02/03/2020 06:44 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick W. Henning, Andre Schoorl and Julie Su in 20-55106 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11583550] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:32 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant IBT in 20-55107 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11583466] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:11 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 20-55106 and 20-55107. The appeals, filed January 29, 2020, are preliminary injunction appeals. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaires are due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief(s) and excerpts of record are due not later than February 26, 2020; the consolidated answering brief is due March 25, 2020, or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief(s) are due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for appeal No. 20-55106 remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment. Failure to pay the fees or failure to timely file the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11580087] [20-55106, 20-55107] (AF) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:13 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Andrew Tauber, Evan Mark Tager, Miriam R. Nemetz for party(s) Appellee Ravinder Singh Appellee Thomas Odom Appellee California Trucking Association, in case 20-55106. [11579794] (CW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:57 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miriam R. Nemetz (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579774] [20-55106] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:48 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Tauber (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579765] [20-55106] (Tauber, Andrew) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:44 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Evan M. Tager (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579742] [20-55106] (Tager, Evan) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:40 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11579177] (JBS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: CTA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA TRUCKING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Evan Mark Tager
Represented By: Alexander M. Chemers
Represented By: Spencer C. Skeen Esquire
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson Esquire III
Represented By: Andrew Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS ODOM
Represented By: Evan Mark Tager
Represented By: Alexander M. Chemers
Represented By: Spencer C. Skeen Esquire
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson Esquire III
Represented By: Andrew Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAVINDER SINGH
Represented By: Evan Mark Tager
Represented By: Alexander M. Chemers
Represented By: Spencer C. Skeen Esquire
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemetz
Represented By: Robert R. Roginson Esquire III
Represented By: Andrew Tauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK W. HENNING, in his official capacity as the Director of the Employment Development Department
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDRE SCHOORL, in his official capacity as the Acting Director of the Department of Industrial Relations of the State of California
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as Labor Commissioner of the State of California, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JULIE SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOS ANGELES CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF OAKLAND
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA LABOR FEDERATION, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?