Alex Baah v. AT&T Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES LLC and AT&T INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALEX BAAH
Case Number: 20-55515
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Alex Baah letter dated 05/15/2020 re: proof of service of payment of fees to DC. NAN. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11698652] (CW) [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:05 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 05/21/2020. [11698200] (BY) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:43 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11691128] (CKP) [Entered: 05/14/2020 02:10 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Alex Baah opening brief due 07/20/2020. Appellees AT&T Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC and Pacific Bell Telephone Company answering brief due 08/20/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11687907] (RT) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alex Baah v. AT&T Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey Peter Ames Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Peter Ames Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AT&T INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Peter Ames Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEX BAAH
Represented By: Alex Baah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?