WB Music Corp., et al v. Royce Intl. Broadcasting Corp., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: HI MOM I DIT IT, EMI APRIL MUSIC INC., DIVINE MILL MUSIC, OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC, WB MUSIC CORP., UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC., NICE HAIR PUBLISHING, SONY ATV TUNES, LLC, HUNTERBORO MUSIC, ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING, FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, UH OH ENTERTAINMENT, BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP., CHEBRA MUSIC and YEAH BABY MUSIC
Defendant / Appellant: GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION, PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC and EDWARD R STOLZ, Esquire
Receiver: W. LAWRENCE PATRICK
Case Number: 20-55806
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11825577] (VS) [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:22 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/15/2020, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 09/10/2020 ). [11808837] (VS) [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:09 AM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/10/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11799342] (VS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:49 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11788795]. [20-55806] (AD) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:44 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC, Edward R Stolz, Esquire and Golden State Broadcasting Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/13/2020. [11788740] [20-55806] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:30 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/04/2020. Transcript due 10/05/2020. Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz opening brief due 11/13/2020. Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, W. Lawrence Patrick, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music answering brief due 12/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11779663] (JBS) [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: WB Music Corp., et al v. Royce Intl. Broadcasting Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HI MOM I DIT IT
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIVINE MILL MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WB MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICE HAIR PUBLISHING
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SONY ATV TUNES, LLC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HUNTERBORO MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PARTY ROCK MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UH OH ENTERTAINMENT
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHEBRA MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: YEAH BABY MUSIC
Represented By: Sharon Douglass Mayo
Represented By: Jackson Paul Wagener
Represented By: Cassandra Eva Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWARD R STOLZ, Esquire
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: W. LAWRENCE PATRICK
Represented By: Rory Stuart Miller
Represented By: Fred D. Heather Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?