ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Aetna Health and Life Insuranc, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS CITY, HUMANA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., COVENTRY HEALTH CARE, INC., PROVIDENCE HEALTH ASSURANCE, HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION, BEACON HEALTH OPTIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC., GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC., HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC., OPTUM SERVICES, INC., HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MEDICAL MUTUAL OF OHIO, UNITED MEDICAL RESOURCES, INC., HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ALABAMA, USABLE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CONNECTICARE, INC., VALUEOPTIONS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC., HUMANA INC., MHNET SPECIALTY SERVICES LLC, AETNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, HEALTH NET, INC., SCOTT AND WHITE HEALTHCARE, VALUEOPTIONS OF CALIFORNIA,, FIRST HEALTH GROUP CORPORATION, CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., BEACON HEALTH OPTIONS, INC., CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTT AND WHITE CARE PLANS, SCOTT AND WHITE HEALTH PLAN, HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC., BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS, INC., BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC., BEACON HEALTH STRATEGIES, LLC, PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, MERITAIN HEALTH, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., HMC HEALTHWORKS, INC., SIERRA HEALTH AND LIFE COMPANY, AMERIHEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC., HUMANA EMPLOYERS HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC., BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE, PROVIDENCE HEALTH PLAN, CIGNA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., PACIFICSOURCE HEALTH PLANS and BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MISSISSIPPI
Plaintiff / Appellant: ABC SERVICES GROUP, INC., in its capacity as assignee for the benefit of creditors for Morningside Recovery, LLC,
Case Number: 20-55821
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 Terminated Appellees Connecticare, Inc., Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net of California, Inc. and Health Net, Inc. in 20-55821 [11834917] (WL) [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:42 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SSR): Appellants unopposed motions (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 19 ] & [ # 23 ]) to voluntarily dismiss certain appellees are granted in part. This appeal is dismissed as to appellees Health Net of California, Inc., Health Net, Inc., Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net Health Plan of Oregon, Inc., Health Net of Arizona, Inc., and ConnectiCare, Inc. only. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to the above-mentioned appellees only. Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 19 ]) is denied as unnecessary as to Centene Corporation because Centene Corporation is not a party to this appeal. The appeal shall continue as to the remaining parties. The opening brief remains due November 17, 2020. The answering briefs are due December 17, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the extent practicable. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to 9th Cir. R. 32-2. [11834912] (WL) [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:38 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 24 Added Attorney(s) Joanna Sobol McCallum for party(s) Appellee Health Net Life Insurance Company Appellee Health Net of California, Inc. Appellee Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company California Physicians Service Appellee Health Net, Inc., in case 20-55821. [11827199] (RR) [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:22 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Appellant ABC Services Group, Inc. Unopposed Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 09/17/2020. [11827082] [20-55821] (Garner, Craig) [Entered: 09/17/2020 07:26 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joanna Sobol McCallum (Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP, 2049 Century Park East, 17th Fl., Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company California Physicians Service, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net of California, Inc. and Health Net, Inc.. Date of service: 09/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11826517] [20-55821] (McCallum, Joanna) [Entered: 09/16/2020 02:26 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ileana Maria Hernandez (Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company California Physicians Service, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net of California, Inc. and Health Net, Inc.. Substitution for Attorney Ileana Maria Hernandez for Appellees Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company California Physicians Service, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net of California, Inc. and Health Net, Inc.. Date of service: 09/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11824892] [20-55821] (Hernandez, Ileana) [Entered: 09/15/2020 02:03 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 Mail returned on 09/14/2020 addressed to Mr. Francis X. Manning, Esquire for AmeriHealth Insurance Company of New Jersey, re: 08/12/2020 Case Opening Information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; counsel is registered for electronic noticing. [11823102] (JBS) [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:10 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellant ABC Services Group, Inc. Unopposed Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 09/03/2020. [11812337] [20-55821] (Garner, Craig) [Entered: 09/03/2020 12:17 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/17/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11812306] (CL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 12:01 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 Added Attorney(s) Colin D. Dougherty for party(s) Appellee Coventry Health Care, Inc. Appellee First Health Group Corporation Appellee Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company Appellee Meritain Health, Inc. Appellee MHNet Specialty Services LLC, in case 20-55821. [11810503] (RR) [Entered: 09/02/2020 10:02 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Colin D. Dougherty (Fox Rothschild LLP, 10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200, P.O. Box 3001, Blue Bell, PA 19422-3001) for Appellees Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Health Care, Inc., First Health Group Corporation, Meritain Health, Inc. and MHNet Specialty Services LLC. Date of service: 09/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11810239] [20-55821] (Dougherty, Colin) [Entered: 09/02/2020 06:50 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 Added Attorney(s) Benjamin H. McCoy for party(s) Appellee Coventry Health Care, Inc. Appellee First Health Group Corporation Appellee Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company Appellee Meritain Health, Inc. Appellee MHNet Specialty Services LLC, in case 20-55821. [11809684] (RR) [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:28 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Benjamin H. McCoy (Fox Rothschild LLP, 10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200, P.O. Box 3001, Blue Bell, PA 19422-3001) for Appellees Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Health Care, Inc., First Health Group Corporation, Meritain Health, Inc. and MHNet Specialty Services LLC. Date of service: 09/01/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11809558] [20-55821] (McCoy, Benjamin) [Entered: 09/01/2020 01:32 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 COURT CORRECTION: Entered appearance of Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Mississippi. [11808464] (SLM) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:32 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Added Attorney(s) Michelle Elaine Robberson for party(s) Appellee Scott and White Healthcare Appellee Scott and White Care Plans Appellee Scott and White Health Plan. [11799726] (RL) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:31 AM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michelle E. Robberson (Cooper & Scully, P.C., 900 Jackson Street, Suite 100, Dallas, Texas 75202) for Appellees Scott and White Health Plan, Scott and White Care Plans and Scott and White Healthcare. Date of service: 08/24/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11799586] [20-55821] (Robberson, Michelle) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:54 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John J. Shaeffer (Fox Rothschild LLP, 10250 Constellation Blvd., Suite 900, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellees Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company, Coventry Health Care, Inc., First Health Group Corporation, MHNet Specialty Services LLC and Meritain Health, Inc.. Date of service: 08/20/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11795920] [20-55821] (Shaeffer, John) [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:18 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 COURT CORRECTION: Added to docket in error. Terminated Stephanie Phan for United Medical Resources, Inc., United Healthcare Services Inc., United Behavioral Health, Sierra Health and Life Company, Optum Services, Inc. and Golden Rule Insurance Company in 20-55821 [11795493] (SLM) [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:17 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Raymond A. Cardozo for party(s) Appellee Health Care Service Corporation Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City Appellee Molina Healthcare of California, Inc. Appellee Molina Healthcare, Inc., in case 20-55821. [11795443] (RR) [Entered: 08/19/2020 03:59 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Bridget B. Vick for party(s) Appellee Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee Inc., in case 20-55821. [11795409] (RR) [Entered: 08/19/2020 03:48 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11794949]. [20-55821] (AD) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:44 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Raymond A. Cardozo (Reed Smith LLP, 101 Second Street, Suite 1800, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellees Health Care Service Corporation, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Molina Healthcare of California, Inc. and Molina Healthcare, Inc.. Date of service: 08/19/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11794705] [20-55821] (Cardozo, Raymond) [Entered: 08/19/2020 10:40 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bridget Burke Vick (Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP, 600 Travis Street, Suite 4200, Houston, Texas 77002) for Appellee Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee Inc.. Date of service: 08/19/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11794544] [20-55821] (Vick, Bridget) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:54 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant ABC Services Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/19/2020. [11794528] [20-55821] (Garner, Craig) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:50 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Added Attorney(s) Derek S. Davis for party(s) Appellee Scott and White Healthcare Appellee Scott and White Care Plans Appellee Scott and White Health Plan, in case 20-55821. [11794388] (BY) [Entered: 08/19/2020 08:47 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant ABC Services Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/19/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/10/2020. Transcript due 10/08/2020. Appellant ABC Services Group, Inc. opening brief due 11/17/2020. Appellees Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company, AmeriHealth Insurance Company of New Jersey, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company Blue Cross of California, Inc., Beacon Health Options of California, Inc., Beacon Health Options, Inc., Beacon Health Strategies, LLC, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company California Physicians Service, Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee Inc., Cigna Behavioral Health of California, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Healthcare of California, Inc., Connecticare, Inc., Coventry Health Care, Inc., First Health Group Corporation, Golden Rule Insurance Company, HMC Healthworks, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Health Net of California, Inc., Health Net, Inc., Humana Behavioral Health, Inc., Humana Employers Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan of California Inc., Humana Health Plan of Texas, Inc., Humana Inc., Humana Insurance Company, MHNet Specialty Services LLC, Medical Mutual of Ohio, Meritain Health, Inc., Molina Healthcare of California, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Pacificsource Health Plans, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health Assurance, Providence Health Plan, Scott and White Care Plans, Scott and White Health Plan, Scott and White Healthcare, Sierra Health and Life Company, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Services Inc., United Medical Resources, Inc., ValueOptions Federal Services, Inc. and ValueOptions of California, answering brief due 12/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11786600] (RT) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Aetna Health and Life Insuranc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn Esquire
Represented By: Samrah Mahmoud
Represented By: Steven D. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger Esquire
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COVENTRY HEALTH CARE, INC.
Represented By: John J. Shaeffer
Represented By: Benjamin H. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROVIDENCE HEALTH ASSURANCE
Represented By: Arden J. Olson
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger Esquire
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEACON HEALTH OPTIONS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Henry I. Willett III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF TEXAS, INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN OF LOUISIANA, INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Ileana Maria Hernandez
Represented By: John Michael LeBlanc Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEDICAL MUTUAL OF OHIO
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED MEDICAL RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Neil J. Barker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USABLE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason Yon-Wai Wu
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Represented By: Michael A. Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONNECTICARE, INC.
Represented By: Carol Burney Lewis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALUEOPTIONS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Henry I. Willett III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MHNET SPECIALTY SERVICES LLC
Represented By: John J. Shaeffer
Represented By: Benjamin H. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AETNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John J. Shaeffer
Represented By: Benjamin H. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEALTH NET, INC.
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Ileana Maria Hernandez
Represented By: John Michael LeBlanc Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT AND WHITE HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Alan Law
Represented By: Michelle Elaine Robberson
Represented By: Derek S. Davis
Represented By: Alan Frank Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALUEOPTIONS OF CALIFORNIA,
Represented By: Henry I. Willett III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST HEALTH GROUP CORPORATION
Represented By: John J. Shaeffer
Represented By: Benjamin H. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Mazda K. Antia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEACON HEALTH OPTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Henry I. Willett III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Mazda K. Antia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT AND WHITE CARE PLANS
Represented By: Alan Law
Represented By: Michelle Elaine Robberson
Represented By: Derek S. Davis
Represented By: Alan Frank Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT AND WHITE HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Alan Law
Represented By: Michelle Elaine Robberson
Represented By: Derek S. Davis
Represented By: Alan Frank Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Ileana Maria Hernandez
Represented By: John Michael LeBlanc Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF KANSAS, INC.
Represented By: Jason Yon-Wai Wu
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Represented By: Michael A. Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF TENNESSEE INC.
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim Esquire
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esquire
Represented By: Bridget B. Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEACON HEALTH STRATEGIES, LLC
Represented By: Henry I. Willett III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES
Represented By: Arden J. Olson
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERITAIN HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: John J. Shaeffer
Represented By: Benjamin H. McCoy Esquire
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger Esquire
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei Esquire
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HMC HEALTHWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Rodney James Jacob Esquire
Represented By: Kathleen V. Fisher Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIERRA HEALTH AND LIFE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel M. Glassman Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Stephanie Phan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERIHEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Francis X. Manning Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger Esquire
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei Esquire
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUMANA EMPLOYERS HEALTH PLAN OF GEORGIA, INC.
Represented By: Ronald Keith Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Ileana Maria Hernandez
Represented By: John Michael LeBlanc Esquire
Represented By: Joanna Sobol McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROVIDENCE HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Arden J. Olson
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIGNA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Represented By: Jeanne Detch
Represented By: Mazda K. Antia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACIFICSOURCE HEALTH PLANS
Represented By: Joseph Christopher Campo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Jason Yon-Wai Wu
Represented By: Kimberly A. Klinsport
Represented By: Michael A. Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ABC SERVICES GROUP, INC., in its capacity as assignee for the benefit of creditors for Morningside Recovery, LLC,
Represented By: Rochelle J. Bioteau
Represented By: Craig Boyd Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?