Art Tobias v. Daniel East, et al
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, MICHAEL ARTEAGA, Detective, No 32722, BORNE, Officer, No 38351, JULIAN PERE, Detective, No 27434, J. MOTTO, Detective, No 25429, DOES, Unidentified Employees of the City of Los Angeles, JEFF CORTINA, Detective, No 35632 and MARSHALL COOLEY, Officer, No 38940
Defendant / Appellant: DANIEL EAST, L.A. School Police Officer, No 959
Plaintiff / Appellee: ART TOBIAS
Case Number: 20-55845
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellee Art Tobias motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: exhibits. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11839972] [20-55845]--[COURT UPDATE: updated docket text to reflect contents of submission, attached corrected PDFs of exhibits and certificate of service. 10/02/2020 by KT] (Owens, David) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:15 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee Art Tobias reply to response to order to show cause dated 09/16/2020. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11839938] [20-55845] (Owens, David) [Entered: 09/28/2020 04:56 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Daniel East response to Court order dated 08/27/2020. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11827000] [20-55845] (House, Calvin) [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:36 PM]
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because an order denying qualified immunity on the ground that a genuine issue of material fact exists is not a final, immediately appealable order. See Maropulos v. County of Los Angeles, 560 F.3d 974, 975 (9th Cir. 2009); see also Rodriguez v. County of Los Angeles, 891 F.3d 776, 791-92 (9th Cir. 2018). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11805057] (OC) [Entered: 08/27/2020 01:47 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/25/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11801991]. [20-55845] (AD) [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:44 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Daniel East Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/25/2020. [11801872] [20-55845] (House, Calvin) [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:51 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Daniel East Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/26/2020. Appellant Daniel East opening brief due 10/19/2020. Appellee Art Tobias answering brief due 11/18/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11794508] (JBS) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Art Tobias v. Daniel East, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ARTEAGA, Detective, No 32722
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORNE, Officer, No 38351
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN PERE, Detective, No 27434
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. MOTTO, Detective, No 25429
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, Unidentified Employees of the City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF CORTINA, Detective, No 35632
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL COOLEY, Officer, No 38940
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DANIEL EAST, L.A. School Police Officer, No 959
Represented By: Calvin House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ART TOBIAS
Represented By: Megan Pierce
Represented By: Anand Swaminathan
Represented By: Anya Jennifer Goldstein
Represented By: David B. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?