Shawn Gordon v. U.S. Bank, N.A., et al
Defendant: OLD REPUBLIC DEFAULT MANAGEMENT SERVICES and QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellee: FAY SERVICING, LLC and U.S. BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAWN GORDON
Case Number: 20-55850
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/05/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11841593] (CL) [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:41 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 09/25/2020. [11836951] (BY) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:09 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/29/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11825451] (CL) [Entered: 09/15/2020 07:35 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/02/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11811768]. [20-55850] (AD) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:44 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Shawn Gordon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/02/2020. [11811750] [20-55850] (Rodriguez, Patricia) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:44 PM]
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11805203] (TSP) [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:37 PM]
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11804818] (LW) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:35 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Shawn Gordon Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/26/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/18/2020. Transcript due 10/19/2020. Appellant Shawn Gordon opening brief due 11/27/2020. Appellees Fay Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11795245] (JBS) [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawn Gordon v. U.S. Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAY SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Jana Logan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD REPUBLIC DEFAULT MANAGEMENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN GORDON
Represented By: Patricia Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?