Elaine Walker Earle v. Unum Life Insurance Company of, et al
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 10 Inclusive and GROUP BASIC ACCIDENTAL DEATH AND DISMEMBERMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Plaintiff / Appellant: ELAINE MARIE WALKER EARLE
Defendant / Appellee: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-55868
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellee only, 10/28/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Elaine Marie Walker Earle opening brief due 11/25/2020. Appellee Unum Life Insurance Company of America answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11859817] (CL) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:05 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 10/07/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/05/2020 ). [11847711] (CL) [Entered: 10/05/2020 02:23 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 10/05/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11836315] (CL) [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:46 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/23/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11814543] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:48 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/01/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11809454]. [20-55868] (AD) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:44 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/01/2020. [11808956] [20-55868] (Blohm, Nicole) [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:04 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11807819]. [20-55868] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 12:44 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Elaine Marie Walker Earle Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11807311] [20-55868] (Petti, Russell) [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:26 AM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Elaine Marie Walker Earle Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2020. Appellant Elaine Marie Walker Earle opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellee Unum Life Insurance Company of America answering brief due 11/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11800479] (RT) [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elaine Walker Earle v. Unum Life Insurance Company of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP BASIC ACCIDENTAL DEATH AND DISMEMBERMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELAINE MARIE WALKER EARLE
Represented By: Scott E. Calvert
Represented By: Russell George Petti
Represented By: Michael Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicole Yvette Blohm Esquire
Represented By: Tatiana S. Nunneri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?