Emily Roe, et al v. Stanford Health Care, et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LOS ANGELES COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, Interested Party
Defendant / Appellee: FREDERICK DIRBAS, Dr., THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDRENS HOSPITAL AT STANDORD, THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE STANFORD HEALTH CARE, THE LELAND JUNIOR UNIVERSITY, DEBRA ZUMWALT, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF STANFORD UNIVERSITY, STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, FKA Stanford Hospitals and Clinics and STANFORD HEALTHCARE BILLING DEPARTMENT
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMILY ROE, Relator; ex. rel. United States of America; ex. rel. State of California
Case Number: 20-55874
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/23/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11868445] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 11:42 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant and appellant,10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees,10/22/2020, 10:30 a.m. PacificSee order for details. [11858891] (VS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:34 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Streamlined request [15] by Appellant Emily Roe to extend time to file the brief is approved in part. Streamlined requests only allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Emily Roe opening brief due 11/25/2020. Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, Stanford Healthcare Billing Department, The Board of Directors of the Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Standord, The Board of Directors of the Stanford Health Care, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt answering brief due 12/28/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11857130] (JN) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:52 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Emily Roe. New requested due date is 11/27/2020. [11857026] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:25 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) The court has received appellees objection to the reply in support of the emergency motion and appellants objection to appellees objection (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ]). The Clerk will maintain appellants reply in support of the motion (Docket Entry No. [10]) under seal. The emergency motion for a stay pending appeal of the district courts August 21, 2020 order and July 13, 2020 order (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418 (2009). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11826854] (JMR) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:44 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825271] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:37 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Debra Zumwalt, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage and The Leland Junior University Correspondence: Objection to Reply (ECF 10). Date of service: 09/14/2020 [11823586] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:08 PM]
September 13, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Correspondence: Amended certificate of service for motion to stay order pending appeal. Date of service: 09/13/2020. [11821611] [20-55874]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/14/2020 by SLM] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:36 PM]
September 13, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe reply to response (). Date of service: 09/13/2020. [11821610] [20-55874]--[Edited: sealed per order [ # 14 ]. 09/16/2020 by SLM] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:30 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821344] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:52 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Frank E. Sheeder III for party(s) Appellee Debra Zumwalt, Appellee The Leland Junior University, Appellee Frederick Dirbas, Appellee Stanford Health Care Advantage, Appellee The Board of Trustees of Stanford University and Appellee Stanford Health Care, in case 20-55874. [11820416] (QDL) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:12 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank E. Sheeder, III (Alston & Bird LLP, 2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300, Dallas, Texas 75201) for Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11820394] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:04 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: M-KS): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay the district courts August 21, 2020 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]). The response is due September 11, 2020, by 5:00 p.m. PDT. The reply in support of the motion is due September 14, 2020, by 12:00 p.m. PDT. [11818263] (AF) [Entered: 09/09/2020 05:18 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/08/2020. [11816867] [20-55874] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 9/9/2020 by TYL] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:49 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/14/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11812284] (VS) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:53 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11808652]. [20-55874] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:44 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808042] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:21 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Emily Roe Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/01/2020. Appellant Emily Roe opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, Stanford Healthcare Billing Department, The Board of Directors of the Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Standord, The Board of Directors of the Stanford Health Care, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt answering brief due 11/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11802204] (RT) [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Emily Roe, et al v. Stanford Health Care, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FREDERICK DIRBAS, Dr.
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDRENS HOSPITAL AT STANDORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE STANFORD HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE LELAND JUNIOR UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA ZUMWALT
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF STANFORD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANFORD HEALTH CARE, FKA Stanford Hospitals and Clinics
Represented By: Kimberly K. Chemerinsky
Represented By: Frank E. Sheeder III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANFORD HEALTHCARE BILLING DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOS ANGELES COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMILY ROE, Relator; ex. rel. United States of America; ex. rel. State of California
Represented By: Gloria M. Juarez
Represented By: Gloria M. Juarez Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?