Heidi Lobstein, et al v. Washington Mutual Mortgage Pas, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI, CITY OF TALLAHASSEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM, WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIES 2007-OC1, Erroneously Sued As US Bank National Association as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank NA, POLICEMENS ANNUITY AND BENEFIT FUND OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO, IOWA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CENTRAL STATES SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS PENSION FUND, VERMONT PENSION INVESTMENT COMMITTEE, LABORERS PENSION FUND AND HEALTH AND WELFARE DEPARTMENT OF THE CONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL OF CHICAGO AND VICINITY, ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, ALAN DAVID TIKAL, as Trustee of the KATN Revocable Living Trust, WASHINGTON STATE INVESTMENT BOARD and ARKANSAS TEACHER RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Plaintiff / Appellant: HEIDI M. LOBSTEIN and MARGUERITE DESELMS
Case Number: 20-55998
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Streamlined request [4] by Appellants Marguerite Deselms and Heidi M. Lobstein to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLANTS. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Marguerite Deselms and Heidi M. Lobstein opening brief due 12/30/2020. Appellees Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, City of Tallahassee Retirement System, Iowa Public Employees Retirement System, Laborers Pension Fund and Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of the City of Chicago, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, Alan David Tikal, Vermont Pension Investment Committee, Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates WMALT Series 2007-OC1 and Washington State Investment Board answering brief due 01/29/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11907242] (DLM) [Entered: 11/25/2020 05:09 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Heidi M. Lobstein. New requested due date is 12/30/2020. [11906555] [20-55998] (Lobstein, Heidi) [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:04 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Mail returned on 10/16/2020 addressed to Marguerite Deselms, re: 09/28/2020 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [11862241] (LA) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:27 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 09/28/2020. [11840280] (BY) [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:03 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Marguerite Deselms and Heidi M. Lobstein opening brief due 11/30/2020. Appellees Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, City of Tallahassee Retirement System, Iowa Public Employees Retirement System, Laborers Pension Fund and Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, Policemens Annuity and Benefit Fund of the City of Chicago, Public Employees Retirement System of Mississippi, Alan David Tikal, Vermont Pension Investment Committee, Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates WMALT Series 2007-OC1 and Washington State Investment Board answering brief due 12/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11839676] (RT) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Heidi Lobstein, et al v. Washington Mutual Mortgage Pas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF TALLAHASSEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHINGTON MUTUAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES WMALT SERIES 2007-OC1, Erroneously Sued As US Bank National Association as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank NA
Represented By: Rebecca L. Wilson Esquire
Represented By: Steven M. Dailey Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POLICEMENS ANNUITY AND BENEFIT FUND OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IOWA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL STATES SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS PENSION FUND
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERMONT PENSION INVESTMENT COMMITTEE
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LABORERS PENSION FUND AND HEALTH AND WELFARE DEPARTMENT OF THE CONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL OF CHICAGO AND VICINITY
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN DAVID TIKAL, as Trustee of the KATN Revocable Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHINGTON STATE INVESTMENT BOARD
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARKANSAS TEACHER RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Jennifer L. Joost Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HEIDI M. LOBSTEIN
Represented By: Heidi M. Lobstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARGUERITE DESELMS
Represented By: Marguerite Deselms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?