Estate of William D. Pilgrim, et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALAN FERRER, MARC ADAMS, DEVRY DAVIS, ALAN PELLETIER, HOWARD KOPEL, ADAM BALDUCCI, MIKE PETERS, ANTHONY STACK, ROGER L. BROWNING, AARON CLARK, DAVID WARD, JAMES OSHEIM, KALEB ISLEY, LYLE BARKLEY, ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. PILGRIM, JOHN PENDLETON, RANDY STANDKE, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN CONSTANTINE, ROBERT L. BRIGGS, ROBERT C. MURPHY, FRANK L. JUZSWIK, JEFFREY M. MILLSLAGLE, SHAWN BAIN, JOHN PARSONS, JARED KILEY, MORRIS SMITH, TUAN BUI, KAI QIAN, JEFF KOLODZI, JOHN LEBAR, CHAD REESE, MARK ROWE, EDWIN ROJAS, DENNIS PALMQUIST, MATHEW EVANS, RICHARD JENKINS, ROBERT GEISS, BRADLEY GRANT, DEREK VAN DEN TOP, DAVID PENROD, ROBERT EDGAR, JACK WOODALL, DALLAS WICKER, JEROME E. PEDERSON, MIGUEL QUEZADA, EDWIN WILLIAM KRAUSE, ROY HALEEN, BENJAMIN LUKE, AHMED J. CANNON, WILLIAM CHURCH, MICHAEL FERNANDEZ, S. GARRETT BECK, DAVID SHELDON, LYLE DUNAHOO, ANDRES FREY, individuals, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, JAN ENGWIS and WALTER GOETZMAN
Defendant / Appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 20-56073
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 15, 2021 ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. PILGRIM V. GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellee General Motors LLC reply to response (). Date of service: 12/07/2020. [11917790] [20-56073] (Ross, April) [Entered: 12/07/2020 05:02 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marc Adams, Lyle Barkley, Michael Fernandez, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Howard Kopel, Benjamin Luke, Robert C. Murphy, Dennis Palmquist, John Pendleton, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Mark Rowe, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke and Dallas Wicker Response opposing motion (motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 12/03/2020. [11914609] [20-56073]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 12/04/2020 by SLM] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:41 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellee General Motors LLC Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 11/23/2020. [11903848] [20-56073] (Ross, April) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:57 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA) Appellants emergency motion to stay the district court proceedings (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) is denied. The briefing schedule previously established remains in effect. [11899953] (JMR) [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:43 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellee General Motors LLC response opposing motion ([ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 8 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11893996] [20-56073] (Ross, April) [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:49 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11892823] (BLS) [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:36 PM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LAB): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay district court proceedings at Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]. Appellees response to the emergency motion is due by 12:00 pm Pacific Time on Monday, November 16, 2020. Appellants optional reply in support of the motion is due by 9:00 am Pacific Time on Tuesday, November 17, 2020. [11889071] (AF) [Entered: 11/10/2020 05:12 PM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marc Adams, Lyle Barkley, Michael Fernandez, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Howard Kopel, Benjamin Luke, Robert C. Murphy, Dennis Palmquist, John Pendleton, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Mark Rowe, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke and Dallas Wicker EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 11/10/2020. [11888872] [20-56073] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:35 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marc Adams, Lyle Barkley, Michael Fernandez, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Howard Kopel, Benjamin Luke, Robert C. Murphy, Dennis Palmquist, John Pendleton, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Mark Rowe, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke and Dallas Wicker Correspondence: Notice of Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Compliance with Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Date of service: 10/29/2020. [11876576] [20-56073] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 10/29/2020 06:22 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/12/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11876200] (BLS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:24 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11869315]. [20-56073] (AD) [Entered: 10/22/2020 06:44 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marc Adams, Lyle Barkley, Michael Fernandez, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Howard Kopel, Benjamin Luke, Robert C. Murphy, Dennis Palmquist, John Pendleton, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Mark Rowe, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke and Dallas Wicker Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11868683] [20-56073] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 10/22/2020 01:33 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/20/2020. [11866205] (BY) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:39 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Marc Adams, Shawn Bain, Adam Balducci, Lyle Barkley, S. Garrett Beck, Robert L. Briggs, Roger L. Browning, Tuan Bui, Ahmed J. Cannon, William Church, Aaron Clark, Christopher Martin Constantine, Devry Davis, Lyle Dunahoo, Robert Edgar, Jan Engwis, Estate of William D. Pilgrim, Mathew Evans, Michael Fernandez, Alan Ferrer, Andres Frey, Robert Geiss, Walter Goetzman, Bradley Grant, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Richard Jenkins, Frank L. Juzswik, Jared Kiley, Jeff Kolodzi, Howard Kopel, Edwin William Krause, John Lebar, Benjamin Luke, Jeffrey M. Millslagle, Robert C. Murphy, James Osheim, Dennis Palmquist, John Parsons, Jerome E. Pederson, Alan Pelletier, John Pendleton, David Penrod, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Chad Reese, Edwin Rojas, Mark Rowe, David Sheldon, Morris Smith, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke, Derek Van Den Top, David Ward, Dallas Wicker and Jack Woodall Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/23/2020. Transcript ordered by 11/16/2020. Transcript due 12/15/2020. Appellants Marc Adams, Shawn Bain, Adam Balducci, Lyle Barkley, S. Garrett Beck, Robert L. Briggs, Roger L. Browning, Tuan Bui, Ahmed J. Cannon, William Church, Aaron Clark, Christopher Martin Constantine, Devry Davis, Lyle Dunahoo, Robert Edgar, Jan Engwis, Estate of William D. Pilgrim, Mathew Evans, Michael Fernandez, Alan Ferrer, Andres Frey, Robert Geiss, Walter Goetzman, Bradley Grant, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Richard Jenkins, Frank L. Juzswik, Jared Kiley, Jeff Kolodzi, Howard Kopel, Edwin William Krause, John Lebar, Benjamin Luke, Jeffrey M. Millslagle, Robert C. Murphy, James Osheim, Dennis Palmquist, John Parsons, Jerome E. Pederson, Alan Pelletier, John Pendleton, David Penrod, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Chad Reese, Edwin Rojas, Mark Rowe, David Sheldon, Morris Smith, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke, Derek Van Den Top, David Ward, Dallas Wicker and Jack Woodall opening brief due 01/25/2021. Appellee General Motors LLC answering brief due 02/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11862192] (RT) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:09 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JAY S. BYBEE, Circuit Judges) : in case no. 20-80129 on October 16, 2020: The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district courts September 1, 2020 order striking plaintiffs motion for class certification and class allegations. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). [11862182] (RT) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Estate of William D. Pilgrim, et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN FERRER
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARC ADAMS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEVRY DAVIS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN PELLETIER
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOWARD KOPEL
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADAM BALDUCCI
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKE PETERS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY STACK
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER L. BROWNING
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON CLARK
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID WARD
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES OSHEIM
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KALEB ISLEY
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYLE BARKLEY
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. PILGRIM
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PENDLETON
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY STANDKE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER MARTIN CONSTANTINE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT L. BRIGGS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT C. MURPHY
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK L. JUZSWIK
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY M. MILLSLAGLE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN BAIN
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PARSONS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JARED KILEY
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MORRIS SMITH
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TUAN BUI
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAI QIAN
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFF KOLODZI
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN LEBAR
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHAD REESE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK ROWE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN ROJAS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS PALMQUIST
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATHEW EVANS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD JENKINS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT GEISS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRADLEY GRANT
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEREK VAN DEN TOP
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID PENROD
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT EDGAR
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACK WOODALL
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALLAS WICKER
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEROME E. PEDERSON
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL QUEZADA
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN WILLIAM KRAUSE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY HALEEN
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN LUKE
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHMED J. CANNON
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM CHURCH
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. GARRETT BECK
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SHELDON
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYLE DUNAHOO
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDRES FREY, individuals, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAN ENGWIS
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER GOETZMAN
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Gregory Oxford
Represented By: April N. Ross
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?