Ryan S. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., a Minnesota corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, UHC OF CALIFORNIA, a California corporation, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation and OPTUM, INC., a Delaware corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN S., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 20-56310
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11989959] (VS) [Entered: 02/02/2021 01:30 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 02/02/2021, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [11954549] (VS) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:17 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) A. Marisa Chun for party(s) Appellee Optum, Inc. Appellee OptumInsight, Inc. Appellee United Healthcare Services, Inc. Appellee United Healthcare Insurance Company Appellee United Healthcare Services, LLC Appellee UnitedHealth Group, Inc. Appellee UHC of California Appellee Optum Services, Inc. Appellee United Behavioral Health, Inc.. [11938727] (RL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of A. Marisa Chun (Crowell & Moriing LLP, 3 Embarcadero Center, 26th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94111) for Appellees United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc. and UHC of California. Date of service: 12/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11938696] [20-56310] (Chun, A. Marisa) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:43 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/06/2021, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11937773] (MS) [Entered: 12/23/2020 07:23 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/16/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11929916]. [20-56310] (AD) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:44 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ryan S. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2020. [11929865] [20-56310] (Hopkins, Elizabeth) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:17 PM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ryan S. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/17/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/08/2021. Transcript due 02/08/2021. Appellant Ryan S. opening brief due 03/19/2021. Appellees Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, LLC and UnitedHealth Group, Inc. answering brief due 04/19/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11922177] (JMR) [Entered: 12/10/2020 10:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ryan S. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UHC OF CALIFORNIA, a California corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUM, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jennifer S. Romano
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN S., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Elizabeth Hopkins Esquire
Represented By: Richard T. Collins
Represented By: Daniel J. Callahan Esquire
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor Esquire
Represented By: Damon D. Eisenbrey Esquire
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Damon Eisenbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?